Reports for TeKoSi AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TeKoSi AG
- TeKoSi AG has its legal headquarters in Thayngen, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The company was founded on 27.04.1993.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 27.10.2020.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company TeKoSi AG is the following: CHE-107.477.042.
- There are 12 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: ABRAXOS HOLDING AG, Heplan GmbH, highscan gmbh.
Management (4)
newest board members
Stephan Christian Manzoni,
Hans-Peter Klotz,
Salen Cirikovic,
Ulrich Eugen Hügle
newest authorized signatories
Stephan Christian Manzoni,
Hans-Peter Klotz,
Salen Cirikovic,
Ulrich Eugen Hügle
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.04.1993
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thayngen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.003.686-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.477.042
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt umfassende Dienstleistungen im Bereich Planung, Auswahl, Projektmanagement und Abnahme klassischer und intelligenter Türbau-, Zutritts- und Überwachungs-Lösungen sowie die Herstellung von und den Handel mit Anlagen, Steuerungen, Systemen und Komponenten in den Bereichen Tür- und Tor-Antriebstechnik, Sicherheits-, Zutritts- und Sicherheitstechnik. Die Gesellschaft kann Patente, Handelsmarken, Lizenzen sowie technische und industrielle Kenntnisse erwerben, verwalten und übertragen; die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Industrie- und Handelsunternehmen beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten und Tochtergesellschaften gründen und alle mit den vorgenannten Zwecken unmittelbar oder mittelbar zusammenhängende Geschäfte tätigen. Die Gesellschaft kann Immobilien erwerben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Niggli Treuhand | Münsingen | <2004 | 28.12.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Küchler Informationstechnik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TeKoSi AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005008975, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TeKoSi AG, in Thayngen, CHE-107.477.042, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 04.06.2020, Publ. 1004902781).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gähwiler, Michael Wilhelm, von Kirchberg (SG), in Kirchberg SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004902828, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
TeKoSi AG, in Kirchberg (SG), CHE-107.477.042, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2019, Publ. 1004562269). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Thayngen im Handelsregister des Kantons Schaffhausen eingetragen und im Handelsregister Kanton St. Gallen von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004902781, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
TeKoSi AG, bisher in Kirchberg (SG), CHE-107.477.042, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2019, Publ. 1004562269).
Statutenänderung:
16.03.2020.
Sitz neu:
Thayngen.
Domizil neu:
Erlengasse 3, 8240 Thayngen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Manzoni, Stephan, von Würenlingen, in Würenlingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gähwiler, Michael Wilhelm, von Kirchberg (SG), in Kirchberg SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.