Address
c/o Morandi Frères SA
Route des Troches 1
1562 Corcelles-près-Payerne
Reports for TBB SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TBB SA
- TBB SA is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Corcelles-près-Payerne.
- The management of the company TBB SA consists of 9 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 11.12.2009.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 14.06.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-115.279.751.
- Next to the company TBB SA there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Morandi Frères SA, SSP immobilier SA.
Management (9)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Julienne Gasser,
Dr. Daniel Roger Fürst,
Marco Reber,
Beat Markus Mühlethaler,
Andreas Peter Keusen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Corcelles-près-Payerne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-660.2.833.009-3
UID/VAT
CHE-115.279.751
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la gestion de son propre patrimoine et la participation à d'autres sociétés en Suisse et à l'étranger. Elle peut effectuer toutes transactions commerciales, financières, industrielles ou immobilières. La société peut en outre, en Suisse ou à l'étranger, créer des succursales et des filiales. La société peut gérer des biens pour son propre compte ou pour le compte de tiers et acquérir, détenir et vendre des biens immobiliers. La société peut exercer des activités commerciales en rapport direct ou indirect avec son objet social et prendre toutes les mesures qui paraissent appropriées pour promouvoir son objet social ou qui sont en rapport avec celui-ci. La société peut fournir des garanties de toute nature pour les engagements de ses filiales directes ou indirectes, y compris l'octroi de droits de gage ou de transferts fiduciaires d'actifs de la société ou l'octroi de garanties de toute nature.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 26.01.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PKF Fiduciaire SA, succursale de Lausanne | Lausanne | 07.11.2017 | 25.01.2022 | |
SCF Révision SA, succursale de Lausanne | Lausanne | 25.08.2011 | 06.11.2017 | |
SCF Révision SA | Genève | 17.12.2009 | 24.08.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Tuileries & Briqueteries Bardonnex SA
- T&B Bardonnex SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TBB SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006057767, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
TBB SA, à Corcelles-près-Payerne, CHE-115.279.751 (FOSC du 03.10.2023, p. 0/1005851349). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Gasser Julienne, de Guggisberg, à Bern.
Publication number: HR02-1005851548, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Tuileries & Briqueteries Bardonnex SA, à Bardonnex, CHE-115.279.751 (FOSC du 16.06.2023, p. 0/1005771042). Par suite du transfert de son siège à Corcelles-près-Payerne, la société est inscrite au registre du commerce du canton de Vaud sous la nouvelle raison sociale TBB SA;
par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du registre de Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005851349, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Tuileries & Briqueteries Bardonnex SA, précédemment à Bardonnex, CHE-115.279.751 (FOSC du 16.06.2023, p. 0/1005771042). Siège transféré à Corcelles-près-Payerne.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route des Troches 1, c/o Morandi Frères SA, 1562 Corcelles-près-Payerne. Statuts modifiés le 11.07.2023.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
TBB SA.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but la gestion de son propre patrimoine et la participation à d'autres sociétés en Suisse et à l'étranger. Elle peut effectuer toutes transactions commerciales, financières, industrielles ou immobilières. La société peut en outre, en Suisse ou à l'étranger, créer des succursales et des filiales. La société peut gérer des biens pour son propre compte ou pour le compte de tiers et acquérir, détenir et vendre des biens immobiliers. La société peut exercer des activités commerciales en rapport direct ou indirect avec son objet social et prendre toutes les mesures qui paraissent appropriées pour promouvoir son objet social ou qui sont en rapport avec celui-ci. La société peut fournir des garanties de toute nature pour les engagements de ses filiales directes ou indirectes, y compris l'octroi de droits de gage ou de transferts fiduciaires d'actifs de la société ou l'octroi de garanties de toute nature. L'assemblée générale a introduit une clause statutaire relative à une marge de fluctuation du capital-actions par décision du 07.06.2023;
pour les détails, voir les statuts. Suppression de la disposition relative à la reprise de biens (envisagée) suite à l'abrogation de l'art. 628 aCO.
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
sous forme écrite ou sous forme électronique. L'autre adresse à route des Troches 1, c/o Morant Frères SA, 1562 Corcelles, est radiée. Mühlethaler Beat Markus est désormais de Bettenhausen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.