Reports for Taraconsult AG in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Taraconsult AG in Liquidation
- Taraconsult AG in Liquidation with its legal headquarters in Hünenberg is in liquidation. Taraconsult AG in Liquidation operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company Taraconsult AG in Liquidation, which was founded on the 14.01.2008, consists of 0 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 03.09.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Taraconsult AG in Liquidation is the following: CHE-114.022.221.
- There are 25 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: ABC Transparency GmbH, AEC - swiss Immobilien AG, Atlasinvest AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.01.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hünenberg
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.031.713-6
UID/VAT
CHE-114.022.221
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verkauf, Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland, Erbringung von Beratungs- und damit zusammenhängenden Dienstleistungen, Finanzierung von verbundenen Unternehmen und die bewilligungsfreie Vermittlung von Finanzierungen sowie Erwerb, Verwertung und Verwaltung von Immaterialgüterrechten; kann Tochtergesellschaften errichten sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prosolve SA, Società di revisione contabile e consulenza aziendale | Lugano | 18.01.2008 | 18.04.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Taraconsult Ltd in liquidation
- Taraconsult SA en liquidation
- Taraconsult Ltd
- Taraconsult AG
- Taraconsult SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Taraconsult AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006120398, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Taraconsult AG in Liquidation, in Hünenberg, CHE-114.022.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2021, Publ. 1005237105).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wagner, Jörg, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Glarus Süd, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005237105, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Taraconsult AG, in Zug, CHE-114.022.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 01.06.2021, Publ. 1005200398).
Statutenänderung:
18.06.2021.
Firma neu:
Taraconsult AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Taraconsult Ltd in liquidation) (Taraconsult SA en liquidation).
Sitz neu:
Hünenberg.
Domizil neu:
Bösch 82, 6331 Hünenberg.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Publikation im SHAB. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.06.2021 aufgelöst. [gestrichen: Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.]. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christmann, Thomas, von Zug, in Walchwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wagner, Jörg, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Glarus Süd, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.