Address
c/o Fiduciaire Favre & Perreaud SA
Chemin de Villardin 14
1004 Lausanne
Reports for Synapse Swiss Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Synapse Swiss Sàrl
- Synapse Swiss Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Lausanne and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Other services in education».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 05.07.2018.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 31.05.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-414.626.946.
- Companies with the same address as Synapse Swiss Sàrl: Althani Group SA, Cité-Joie société coopérative, Dr Rheims cosmetics SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.07.2018
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.180.459-7
UID/VAT
CHE-414.626.946
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but d'effectuer des audits, de fournir tous conseil et formation dans les domaines de l'hygiène, de la propreté et de la désinfection; les prestations de nettoyage, d'hygiène et de services dans le domaine de l'entretien, de la maintenance et de l'exploitation de bâtiments, ainsi que de leur environnement; les travaux de désinfecion et de traitement des déchets; le commerce de machines et de toute marchandise (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Synapse Swiss Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005757298, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Synapse Swiss Sàrl, à Lausanne, CHE-414.626.946 (FOSC du 22.09.2020, p. 0/1004983736). Dime Thierry, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 98 parts de CHF 100 à Rocha Lionel, qui n'est plus président, désormais titulaire de 200 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR02-1004983736, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Synapse Swiss Sàrl, à Lausanne, CHE-414.626.946 (FOSC du 10.07.2018, p. 0/4349115). Rocha Lionel, qui est maintenant à Dully, cède 38 de ses 140 parts de CHF 100 à Dime Thierry, désormais titulaire de 98 parts de CHF 100. Rocha Lionel a désormais 102 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: 4349115, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Synapse Swiss Sàrl, à Lausanne, Chemin de Villardin 14, c/o Fiduciaire Favre & Perreaud SA, 1004 Lausanne, CHE-414.626.946. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
29 juin 2018.
But:
la société a pour but d'effectuer des audits, de fournir tous conseil et formation dans les domaines de l'hygiène, de la propreté et de la désinfection;
les prestations de nettoyage, d'hygiène et de services dans le domaine de l'entretien, de la maintenance et de l'exploitation de bâtiments, ainsi que de leur environnement;
les travaux de désinfecion et de traitement des déchets;
le commerce de machines et de toute marchandise (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000. Apport en nature et reprise de biens selon contrat du 12 juin 2018: 7 micro-nébuliseurs, d'une valeur totale de CHF 25'000;
en contrepartie, il est remis 200 parts sociales de CHF 100, le solde de CHF 5'000 constituant une créance de l'apporteur contre la société.
Associés-gérants:
Rocha Lionel, de France, au Mont-sur-Lausanne, avec 140 parts de CHF 100, président, avec signature individuelle, et Dime Thierry, de et à Meyrin, avec 60 parts de CHF 100, avec signature collective à deux.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique. Selon déclaration du 29 juin 2018, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.