Reports for SYMPODE Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SYMPODE Sàrl
- SYMPODE Sàrl in Morges is a Limited liability company from the sector «Fiduciary services». SYMPODE Sàrl is active.
- The management of the company SYMPODE Sàrl, which was founded on the 24.04.2012, consists of 2 persons.
- On the 26.08.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company SYMPODE Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-330.689.318.
- Margencel 7 Développement Sàrl, Massimmo Sàrl have the same address as SYMPODE Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.04.2012
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.106.422-8
UID/VAT
CHE-330.689.318
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Les conseils et gestion des entreprises; l'administration fiscale et comptabilité des autres sociétés; l'investissement dans d'autres sociétés; toute autre activité susceptible de promouvoir la réalisation de son but social (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FIDUCIAIRE SYMJO Sàrl
- FIDUCIAIRE SYMJO Sàrl en liquidation
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SYMPODE Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004965385, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FIDUCIAIRE SYMJO Sàrl, à Aigle, CHE-330.689.318 (FOSC du 31.05.2019, p. 0/1004642132). Statuts modifiés le 12 août 2020.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
SYMPODE Sàrl. Siège transféré à Morges.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue des Vignerons 9, 1110 Morges. L'associé-gérant Mpirwa Sylvestre, qui est nommé président, cède 60 de ses 200 parts de CHF 100 à Bovey Jacques, de Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne, à Morges, nouvel associé avec 60 parts de CHF 100, gérant avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004642132, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FIDUCIAIRE SYMJO Sàrl en liquidation, à Aigle, CHE-330.689.318 (FOSC du 29.10.2014, p. 0/1793671). Selon décision de son assemblée générale du 9 mai 2019, la dissolution de la société est révoquée.
La raison de commerce redevient:
FIDUCIAIRE SYMJO Sàrl. L'associé-gérant Mpirwa Sylvestre, qui n'est plus liquidateur, continue de signer individuellement.
Publication number: 1793671, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FIDUCIAIRE SYMJO Sàrl, à Vevey, CHE-330.689.318 (FOSC du 09.10.2014, p. 0/1759883). Statuts modifiés le 13 octobre 2014. Siège transféré à Aigle.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin des Tilleuls 12, c/o Sylvestre Mpirwa, 1860 Aigle. Selon décision de son assemblée des associés du 13 octobre 2014, la société a prononcé sa dissolution.
La liquidation est opérée sous la raison de commerce:
FIDUCIAIRE SYMJO Sàrl en liquidation. L'associé-gérant Mpirwa Sylvestre est élu liquidateur avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.