Reports for Swisserg SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swisserg SA
- Swisserg SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Pully. Swisserg SA belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 20.06.2019 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 16.05.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-278.307.307.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.06.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pully
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.185.582-3
UID/VAT
CHE-278.307.307
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but toutes activités en relation avec les énergies alternatives ainsi que la distribution et le commerce de produits raffinés tels que carburant diesel et huile de chauffage (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swisserg SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006033713, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swisserg SA, à Pully, CHE-278.307.307 (FOSC du 19.03.2024, p. 0/1005989472). Chevnine Natalya, de et à Lausanne, est membre présidente du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005989472, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swisserg SA, à Pully, CHE-278.307.307 (FOSC du 24.12.2021, p. 0/1005367647). Andreev Andrey n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005367647, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swisserg SA, à Lausanne, CHE-278.307.307 (FOSC du 25.06.2019, p. 0/1004659307). Statuts modifiés le 16.12.2021. Siège transféré à Pully.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin des Bluets 3, c/o Dzmitry Toustsik, 1009 Pully. Toustsik Dzmitry est maintenant à Pully.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.