Address
c/o Susanne Stückelberger
Allenmoosstrasse 66
8057 Zürich
Reports for Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord
- Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord was founded on 06.06.2012.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 11.09.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-167.221.925.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Ursula Singenberger Rouvier,
Mauro Bignotti,
Susanna Stückelberger
newest authorized signatories
Ursula Singenberger Rouvier,
Mauro Bignotti,
Susanna Stückelberger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.06.2012
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.830-8
UID/VAT
CHE-167.221.925
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Unterstützung von Eltern, welche für ihre Kinder die Angebote der Schule Zürich Nord beanspruchen möchten, aber aufgrund ihrer finanziellen Verhältnisse nicht dazu in der Lage sind. Das Angebot soll insbesondere Kindern und Jugendlichen zugute kommen, die aufgrund von individuellen Schwierigkeiten oder besonderen Begleitumständen eine Beschulung in einem kleineren, geschützten Rahmen benötigen. Die Höhe der jeweils geleisteten Beiträge bestimmt sich nach der Einkommenssituation der Eltern und der Höhe des Schuldgeldes. Im Bedarfsfall können auch Beiträge an weitere Kosten wie Reisen, Lager, Essen geleistet werden. Es können auch steuerbegünstigte Institutionen mit ähnlicher Zwecksetzung unterstützt werden. Die Stiftung verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Liguster Treuhand- und Verwaltungs-AG | Zürich | 11.06.2012 | 10.09.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005834773, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord, in Zürich, CHE-167.221.925, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 05.07.2023, Publ. 1005786676). Die Stiftung wurde mit Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 27.06.2023 von der Pflicht befreit, eine Revisionsstelle zu bezeichnen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Liguster Treuhand und Verwaltungs-AG (CHE-107.843.193), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005786676, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord, in Zürich, CHE-167.221.925, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 18.11.2019, Publ. 1004761187).
Urkundenänderung:
09.05.2023. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]
Publication number: HR02-1004761187, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stipendienfonds der Schule Zürich Nord, in Zürich, CHE-167.221.925, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 20.09.2012, S.0, Publ. 6856666).
Domizil neu:
c/o Susanne Stückelberger, Allenmoosstrasse 66, 8057 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Felchlin, Manfred, von Arth, in Dübendorf, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Saxer, Hanspeter, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stucki-Volz, Dr. Germaine, von Tägertschi, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stückelberger, Susanna, von Basel, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bignotti, Mauro, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied und Protokollführer des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Singenberger Rouvier, Ursula, von Lausanne, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Rechnungsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Liguster Treuhand und Verwaltungs-AG (CHE-107.843.193), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Liguster Treuhand- und Verwaltungs-AG (CH-020.3.916.113-0)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.