Reports for Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein
- Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein from Freienstein operates in the sector «Operation of primary schools» and is active.
- Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein was founded on 14.10.2013.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 29.08.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-264.369.762.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Benjamin Ganz,
Danny Koopman,
Andrea Sailer,
Andreas Bänninger,
Susanna Gärtner
newest authorized signatories
Benjamin Ganz,
Danny Koopman,
Andrea Sailer,
Andreas Bänninger,
Susanna Gärtner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.10.2013
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Freienstein-Teufen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.907-0
UID/VAT
CHE-264.369.762
Sector
Operation of primary schools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Hauptzweck der Stiftung ist die Führung und Weiterentwicklung der 'Wohnschule Freienstein' für Kinder und Jugendliche, die einer sonder- und sozialpädagogischen Betreuung und Förderung bedürfen. Nebenzweck der Stiftung ist der naturnahe und tiergerechte Betrieb des Landwirtschaftsbetriebs 'Lindenhof' in Freienstein-Teufen für die Unterstützung ihrer sonder- und sozialpädagogischen Aufgaben. Der Nebenzweck kann auch mittels einer ganzen oder teilweisen Verpachtung des Betriebs verfolgt werden. Die Stiftung gestaltet ihre Tätigkeit so aus, dass sie vom Gemeinwesen, insbesondere vom Bund und Kanton Zürich fachlich und als gemeinnützig anerkannt wird.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
A + B Revisions AG | Winterthur | 17.10.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006116837, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein, in Freienstein-Teufen, CHE-264.369.762, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2024, Publ. 1005966612).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ganz, Benjamin, von Buch am Irchel, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005966612, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein, in Freienstein-Teufen, CHE-264.369.762, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 29.03.2023, Publ. 1005711694).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Alder, Judith, von Winterthur, in Freienstein-Teufen, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koopman, Danny, von Zürich, in Schleitheim, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Eglisau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Bänninger, Andreas, von Embrach, in Andelfingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Sailer, Andrea, von Wil (SG), in Rorbas, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005711694, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Wohnschule Freienstein, in Freienstein-Teufen, CHE-264.369.762, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 20.04.2021, Publ. 1005153432).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gärtner, Susanna, von Wilchingen, in Rorbas, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.