Reports for Stiftung Turmhof
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Turmhof
- Stiftung Turmhof has its legal headquarters in Steckborn, is active and operates in the sector «Sport services».
- Stiftung Turmhof has 10 persons entered in its management.
- On the 21.12.2022 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-109.988.862.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Thomas Feurer,
Max Arnold,
Christine Annemarie Steiger Eggli,
Roland Horst Toleti,
Sabrina Carmen Ulrich
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Feurer,
Max Arnold,
Felix Lieberherr,
Ingrid Schwarzer,
Peter Röthlisberger
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.12.2002
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Steckborn
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.7.015.885-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.988.862
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Erwerb, die Instandstellung und den weitgehend eigenwirtschaftlichen Betrieb des Turmhofs und seiner Nachbarliegenschaften. Zu diesem Zweck kann sie kulturelle, soziale und gewerbliche Einrichtungen selbst betreiben oder Dritte betreiben lassen. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AG Giger Treuhand | Frauenfeld | 20.02.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trewitax Kreuzlingen AG | Kreuzlingen | 17.03.2009 | 19.02.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Turmhof
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005634867, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Turmhof, in Steckborn, CHE-109.988.862, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 71 vom 11.04.2022, Publ. 1005448052).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ullmann, Christoph, von Warth-Weiningen, in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Arnold, Max, von Kemmental, in Weiningen TG (Warth-Weiningen), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Feurer, Thomas, von Schaffhausen, in Steckborn, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1005448052, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Turmhof, in Steckborn, CHE-109.988.862, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 24.03.2022, Publ. 1005434856).
Domizil neu:
Seestrasse 84a, Postfach, 8266 Steckborn. [Teilweise Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Forrer, Roger , von Wattwil, in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kasper, Heinz, von Berlingen, in Berlingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Röthlisberger, Peter, von Steckborn, in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Feurer, Thomas, von Schaffhausen, in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Toleti, Roland Horst, von Gossau (SG), in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ulrich, Sabrina Carmen, von Unterlunkhofen, in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Steiger Eggli, Christine Annemarie, von Dachsen, in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ullmann, Christoph, von Warth-Weiningen, in Steckborn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Lieberherr, Felix, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Steckborn, Geschäftsführer (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005434856, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Turmhof, in Steckborn, CHE-109.988.862, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2021, Publ. 1005367433).
Urkundenänderung:
12.01.2022.
Zweck neu:
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Erwerb, die Instandstellung und den weitgehend eigenwirtschaftlichen Betrieb des Turmhofs und seiner Nachbarliegenschaften. Zu diesem Zweck kann sie kulturelle, soziale und gewerbliche Einrichtungen selbst betreiben oder Dritte betreiben lassen. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter.
Organisation neu:
[Gestrichen aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.]
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.