Reports for Stiftung Tagesschule Birke
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Tagesschule Birke
- Stiftung Tagesschule Birke is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Hausen am Albis. Stiftung Tagesschule Birke belongs to the industry «Operation of primary schools» and is currently active.
- The organization was founded on 24.09.1996.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 13.07.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-110.401.298.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Melanie Romer,
Tamara Meier,
Stephan Ehrsam,
Prisca Wälter,
Anna Maria gen. Annemieke Geiger
newest authorized signatories
Melanie Romer,
Tamara Meier,
Stephan Ehrsam,
Prisca Wälter,
Anna Maria gen. Annemieke Geiger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.09.1996
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Hausen am Albis
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.000.452-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.401.298
Sector
Operation of primary schools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung einer Tagesschule für Kinder mit Lern- und Verhaltensschwierigkeiten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
inVersa GmbH | Zug | 01.02.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OSN Revisions GmbH | Bonstetten | 15.04.2008 | 31.01.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Tagesschule Birke
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005794317, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Tagesschule Birke, in Hausen am Albis, CHE-110.401.298, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2021, Publ. 1005340943).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Tamara, von Glattfelden, in Affoltern am Albis, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Romer, Melanie, von Urdorf, in Bonstetten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005340943, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Tagesschule Birke, in Hausen am Albis, CHE-110.401.298, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 19.11.2020, Publ. 1005026347).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lustig, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005026347, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Tagesschule Birke, in Hausen am Albis, CHE-110.401.298, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 14.10.2019, Publ. 1004736532).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Iten, Hans Jörg, von Unterägeri, in Zürich, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Hausen am Albis];
Lustig, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.