Address
c/o Auslandschweizerwerk der Neuen Helvetischen Gesellschaft
Alpenstrasse 26
3006 Bern
Reports for Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer
- Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer has its legal headquarters in Bern and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer consists of 8 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 31.05.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-109.666.105.
- There are 5 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Auslandschweizer-Organisation, educationsuisse, Oeschger-Hintermann Stiftung der NHG.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Daniel Rolf Vonrufs,
Marc Emmanuel de Araujo,
Ariane Rustichelli,
Alain Philipp Meyer,
Mario Robert Engeler
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Rolf Vonrufs,
Marc Emmanuel de Araujo,
Ariane Rustichelli,
Alain Philipp Meyer,
Derrick Johannes Widmer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.08.1939
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.000.288-4
UID/VAT
CHE-109.666.105
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Stiftung ist die Mitfinanzierung von Projekten und Dienstleistungen der Auslandschweizer-Organisation (ASO) und der ihr angeschlossenen Institutionen im Sinne von Artikel 40 (vierzig) BV. Die Stiftung ist politisch und religiös neutral.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 08.11.2011 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 09.12.2010 | 07.11.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondazione per gli Svizzeri all'estero
- Fundaziun per ils Svizzers a l'ester
- Fondation pour les Suisses à l'étranger
- Per gli Svizzeri all'Estero
- Per ils Svizzers a l'ester
- Für die Auslandschweizer
- Pour les Suisses à l'étranger
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005756682, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer, in Bern, CHE-109.666.105, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 17.11.2020, Publ. 1005024231).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vonrufs, Daniel Rolf, von Erlenbach (ZH), in Bergamo (IT), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
de Araujo, Marc Emmanuel, von Champéry, in Echichens, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005024231, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer, in Bern, CHE-109.666.105, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2019, Publ. 1004664707).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stucky, Georg, von Konolfingen, in Baar, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wüthrich, Peter, von Trub, in Nidau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stern, Jean-Pierre F., von Fribourg und Montagny (FR), in Zürich, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Freiburg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Widmer, Derrick, von Gränichen, in Aarau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Engeler, Mario Robert, genannt Robert, von Ellikon an der Thur, in Thun, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1004664707, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung für die Auslandschweizer, in Bern, CHE-109.666.105, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 21.10.2016, Publ. 3120809).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mastantuoni, Sarah, von Onsernone, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rustichelli, Ariane, von Neuchâtel, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wüthrich, Peter, von Trub, in Nidau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.