Reports for Stiftung Bergschule Avrona
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Bergschule Avrona
- Stiftung Bergschule Avrona is currently active and the industry «Operation of primary schools». The legal headquarters are in Tarasp.
- The management of the organization Stiftung Bergschule Avrona consists of 8 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 16.08.2024.
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung Bergschule Avrona is registered under the UID CHE-107.056.485.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Hans-Peter Spreng,
Astrid Beatrix Baron,
Markus Solinger,
Sebastian Holzhausen,
David Langenegger
newest authorized signatories
Hans-Peter Spreng,
Astrid Beatrix Baron,
Markus Solinger,
Sebastian Holzhausen,
David Langenegger
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.11.1981
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Scuol
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.010-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.056.485
Sector
Operation of primary schools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Bildungsstätte auf Grundlage der Geisteswissenschaft Rudolf Steiners.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Redi AG Treuhand | Frauenfeld | 17.09.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Bergschule Avrona
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Bergschule Avrona
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006108405, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Stiftung Bergschule Avrona, in Scuol, CHE-107.056.485, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 18.04.2024, Publ. 1006012329).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eicher, Sandra, von Zürich und Scuol, in Wallisellen, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spreng, Hans Peter, von Graben, in Burgdorf, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1006012329, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Stiftung Bergschule Avrona, in Scuol, CHE-107.056.485, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2023, Publ. 1005821196).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spreng, Hans Peter, von Graben, in Burgdorf, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005821196, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Stiftung Bergschule Avrona, in Scuol, CHE-107.056.485, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 03.08.2022, Publ. 1005534185).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brodbeck, Markus David, von Basel, in Tarasp, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baron, Astrid Beatrix, von Menzingen, in Baar, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.