Reports for Stawin AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stawin AG
- Stawin AG with its legal headquarters in Pfungen is active. Stawin AG operates in the sector «Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)».
- Stawin AG was founded on 26.11.1975.
- On the 23.07.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Stawin AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-105.879.820.
- Companies with the same address as Stawin AG: Amada Swiss GmbH, BitLane GmbH, DWT Schiemann.
Management (6)
newest board members
Sven Diembeck,
Alexander Ludwig Jansen,
Ludwig Jansen,
Susanne Stadler
newest authorized signatories
Sven Diembeck,
Fabian Winkler,
Alexander Ludwig Jansen,
Ludwig Jansen,
Susanne Stadler
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.11.1975
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Pfungen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.925.100-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.879.820
Sector
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Herstellung von und den Handel mit Türen und Toren sowie weiteren Produkten des Baugewerbes. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Winterthur | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Aktiengesellschaft Stawin Gauger
- AG Stawin Gauger
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Stawin | 17.11.2005 | active | 56289/2005 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Stawin AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006091163, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stawin AG, in Pfungen, CHE-105.879.820, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 18 vom 26.01.2024, Publ. 1005944787).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wehrli, Rolf, von Hüttlingen, in Bürglen TG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Diembeck, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Werther (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Winkler, Fabian, von Dorf, in Dorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005944787, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stawin AG, in Pfungen, CHE-105.879.820, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 11.03.2014, S.0, Publ. 1389895).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peter, Alwin, von Wiesendangen, in Wiesendangen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jansen, Alexander Ludwig, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Surwold (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Jansen, Ludwig, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Surwold (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Stadler, Susanne, von Flawil, in Dättlikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Diembeck, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Werther (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1389895, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stawin AG, in Pfungen, CHE-105.879.820, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 24.10.2012, Publ. 6901950).
Statutenänderung:
25.02.2014.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Herstellung von und den Handel mit Türen und Toren sowie weiteren Produkten des Baugewerbes. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schenker, Robert, von Boningen und Winterthur, in Herrliberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hofmann, Carmela Angela, von Wädenswil, in Bassersdorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Wehrli, Rolf, von Hüttlingen, in Bürglen TG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.