Reports for Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG
- Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG has its legal headquarters in Frauenfeld, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG, which was founded on the 22.04.2005, consists of 4 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.06.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register TG under the UID CHE-112.328.560.
- Eisenbeiz GmbH, Fevesta Wohnbau AG, Genossenschaft Eisenwerk Frauenfeld have the same address as Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Emil Häberlin-Frei,
Rico Lauper,
Thomas Hasler,
Astrid Staufer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.04.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Frauenfeld
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.018.114-8
UID/VAT
CHE-112.328.560
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Architektur-Dienstleistungen für Hoch-, Tief-, öffentliche und private Bauten, insbesondere Beratung, Kostenplanung, Projektierung und Umsetzung solcher Bauvorhaben, sowie Entwicklung, Vermittlung und Handel von und mit Möbeln und Einrichtungsgegenständen. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Kapitalanlagen halten und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rotmonten Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 03.06.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rolf Eggenberger & Partner AG | Grabs | 17.07.2018 | 02.06.2024 | |
Linth Treuhand AG | Rorschach | 28.04.2005 | 16.07.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006046736, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-112.328.560, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2022, Publ. 1005577384).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rolf Eggenberger & Partner AG (CHE-101.645.393), in Grabs, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rotmonten Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-205.494.662), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005577384, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-112.328.560, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2018, Publ. 4363769). [keine Mutation, Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hasler, Thomas, von Lommis, in Frauenfeld, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Häberlin, Emil, von Lengwil, in Illighausen (Lengwil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Staufer, Astrid, von Birrwil, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lauper, Rico, von Schüpfen, in Bottighofen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4363769, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Staufer & Hasler Architekten AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-112.328.560, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 08.04.2014, Publ. 1441945).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Linth Treuhand- und Revisions-AG, in Gossau SG, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rolf Eggenberger & Partner AG (CHE-101.645.393), in Grabs, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.