Reports for SPS Engineering Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SPS Engineering Management AG
- SPS Engineering Management AG in Oberrohrdorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». SPS Engineering Management AG is active.
- SPS Engineering Management AG was founded on 01.03.2007.
- On the 03.02.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company SPS Engineering Management AG is registered under the UID CHE-113.474.773.
- Josef G. Locher Engineering GmbH, Manuel Locher GmbH, Maschinen- und Anlagenbau are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.03.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberrohrdorf
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.030.747-9
UID/VAT
CHE-113.474.773
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verkauf und Implementierung von Industrieprojekten, insbesondere für Kunden in den Prozessindustrie, An- und Verkauf sowie Verwertung von gewerblichen Schutzrechten an Patenten, Marken, Mustern und Modellen; kann auch Handels- und Vermittlungsgeschäfte mit Industrieprodukten aller Art tätigen, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Darlehen gewähren sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Albert Müller, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer, dipl. Buchhalter/Controller | Baden | 27.11.2015 | 02.02.2020 | |
KPMG AG | Aarau | 07.03.2007 | 14.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SWISS PROJECT SOLUTIONS HOLDING LIMITED
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SPS Engineering Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004820712, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SPS Engineering Management AG, in Oberrohrdorf, CHE-113.474.773, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 21.09.2016, Publ. 3066293). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 07.10.2019 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Albert Müller, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer, dipl. Buchhalter/Controller (CHE-107.679.746), in Baden, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3066293, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SPS Engineering Management AG, in Gebenstorf, CHE-113.474.773, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 27.11.2015, Publ. 2507449).
Statutenänderung:
07.09.2016.
Sitz neu:
Oberrohrdorf.
Domizil neu:
Vorderi Böde 4, 5452 Oberrohrdorf.
Publication number: 2507449, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SWISS PROJECT SOLUTIONS HOLDING LIMITED, in Gebenstorf, CHE-113.474.773, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 150 vom 05.08.2011, Publ. 6285310).
Statutenänderung:
19.11.2015.
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der SPS Engineering Management AG, in Gebenstorf ( CHE-113.463.226), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 19.11.2015 und Bilanz per 30.06.2015. Aktiven von CHF 854'611.00 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 437'348.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Firma neu:
SPS Engineering Management AG.
Zweck neu:
Verkauf und Implementierung von Industrieprojekten, insbesondere für Kunden in den Prozessindustrie, An- und Verkauf sowie Verwertung von gewerblichen Schutzrechten an Patenten, Marken, Mustern und Modellen;
kann auch Handels- und Vermittlungsgeschäfte mit Industrieprodukten aller Art tätigen, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Darlehen gewähren sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Mitteilungen neu:
Alle Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief, Telefax oder elektronische Post rechtsgültig an die letzte der Gesellschaft gemeldete Adresse. [Der Verzicht auf die eingeschränkte Revision (opting-out) wurde aufgehoben.] [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 01.11.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. ].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Albert Müller, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer, dipl. Buchhalter/Controller ( CHE-107.679.746), in Baden, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.