Reports for SPITEX Cadi
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SPITEX Cadi
- SPITEX Cadi has its legal headquarters in Rabius, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of general healthcare facilities».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.08.2018.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of GR is CHE-103.064.497.
Management (3)
newest members of the committee
Gabriela Tomaschett-Berther,
René Epp,
Sonia Deflorin-Schlosser
newest authorized signatories
Gabriela Tomaschett-Berther,
René Epp,
Sonia Deflorin-Schlosser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.04.2000
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Sumvitg
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.6.000.176-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.064.497
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein ermöglicht und fördert durch seine Dienste im Sinne der eidgenössischen und kantonalen Gesetzgebung das Wohnen zu Hause für Menschen aller Altersgruppen, welche Pflege, Unterstützung im Haushalt, Betreuung, Begleitung und/oder Beratung benötigen. Zur Erfüllung dieser Aufgaben werden die zentralen Spitex-Dienste angeboten, nämlich: a) Basis- und Behandlungspflege b) Akut- und Übergangspflege c) Haushaltshilfe d) Begleitung e) Mahlzeitendienst. Auf Grund von Art. 12 des Gesundheitsgesetzes (BR 500.000) und Art. 31 KPG, welche die Gemeinden verpflichten, diese Spitex-Dienste ihren Bewohnern anzubieten, delegieren die Gemeinden diese Aufgabe dem Verein. Der Auftrag der Gemeinden an den Verein wird in der individuellen Leistungsvereinbarung definiert. Der Verein kann weitere Aufträge mit ähnlichem Zweck annehmen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SPITEX Cadi
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4441289, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
SPITEX Cadi, in Sumvitg, CHE-103.064.497, Verein (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2016, Publ. 3094083).
Statutenänderung:
20.04.2018.
Domizil neu:
Via Catat 11, 7172 Rabius.
Weitere Adressen:
Caum postal 36, 7172 Rabius. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Berther, Adelrich, von Breil/Brigels, in Danis (Breil/Brigels), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Epp, René, von Silenen, in Tujetsch, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Aktuar, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ohne Angabe zur Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Tomaschett-Berther, Gabriela, von Tujetsch, in Trun, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3094083, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
SPITEX Cadi, in Sumvitg, CHE-103.064.497, Verein (SHAB Nr. 180 vom 17.09.2015, Publ. 2378189).
Domizil neu:
Via Catat 11, Postfach 36, 7172 Rabius.
Publication number: 2378189, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
SPITEX Cadi, in Sumvitg, CHE-103.064.497, Verein (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 13.10.2014, Publ. 1764667).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Candinas, Beat, von Sumvitg, in Surrein (Sumvitg), Vizepräsident und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Epp, René, von Silenen, in Sedrun (Tujetsch), Vizepräsident und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.