About SpeedCom AG
- SpeedCom AG with its legal headquarters in Schaan is a Limited company from the sector «IT services». SpeedCom AG is active.
- The management of the company SpeedCom AG, which was founded on the 14.08.1998, consists of 4 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 03.11.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Amann Architektur, avoris Personal Aktiengesellschaft, Bauelemente Otto Hilti Holding AG have the same address as SpeedCom AG.
Management (4)
Board of directors
Executive board
Andreas Herbert Kollmann,
Urs Frick,
Bruno Schwendener,
Harald Manfred Rüdisser
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Herbert Kollmann,
Urs Frick,
Bruno Schwendener,
Harald Manfred Rüdisser
Commercial register information
Legal headquarters of the company
Schaan
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language)
Planung und Realisation von Kommunikationsanlagen (insbesondere Gegensprech-, Alarm-, Video- und Telefonanlagen) Sowie Beratung in diesem Bereich; Handel mit und Installation von EDV- und Kommunikationsanlagen, Soft- und Hardware sowie entsprechende Wartungs- und Servicedienstleistungen; Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Liegenschaften; Erbringung von Dienstleistungen als Internet-Provider; Übernahme von Generalunternehmungsaufträgen; Erbringung von Vermittlungsdienstleistungen (ausgenommen Dienst- und Stellenvermittlung).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SpeedCom Aktiengesellschaft
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for SpeedCom AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 10683/2022, (1)
SpeedCom AG, in Schaan, FL-0001.545.985-6, Aktiengesellschaft.
Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Schurti, Thomas Manfred, StA: Liechtenstein, 9495 Triesen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Urs Frick oder Andreas Kollmann.
Publication number: 20240959, (1)
Handelsregister 13.09.2018, SpeedCom AG, Schaan (FL-0001.545.985-6) Aktiengesellschaft Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu: Im alten Riet 153, 9494 Schaan.
Publication number: 20240462, (1)
Handelsregister 30.08.2018, SpeedCom AG, Schaan (FL-0001.545.985-6) Aktiengesellschaft Geschäftsadresse neu: Im alten Riet 153, 9494 Schaan.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Frick, Urs, StA: Liechtenstein, 9496 Balzers, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kollmann, Andreas Herbert, StA: Liechtenstein, 9491 Ruggell, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rüdisser, Harald Manfred, StA: Liechtenstein, 9494 Schaan, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Urs Frick oder Andreas Kollmann;
Schurti, Thomas Manfred, StA: Liechtenstein, 9495 Triesen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Urs Frick oder Andreas Kollmann;
Schwendener, Bruno, StA: Schweiz, 9470 Buchs, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Urs Frick oder Andreas Kollmann.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.