Reports for Société du Manège SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société du Manège SA
- Société du Manège SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Les Reussilles. Société du Manège SA belongs to the industry «Agricultural services» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 18.12.1956.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 30.06.2015.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-107.279.275.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.12.1956
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Tramelan
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.002.374-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.279.275
Sector
Agricultural services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Construction et exploitation d'un manège et dépendance à Tramelan.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Société de Contrôle Fiduciaire SA | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 17.08.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société du Manège SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2238945, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Société du Manège SA, à Tramelan, CHE-107.279.275, société anonyme (No. FOSC 157 du 18.08.2014, Publ. 1666641).
Modification des statuts:
07.05.2015.
Nouveau capital-actions libéré:
CHF 170'000.00 [précédemment: CHF 34'000.00]. Libération ultérieure du capital-actions par compensation de créances d'un montant de CHF 136'000.00.
Publication number: 1666641, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Société du Manège S.A., à Tramelan, CHE-107.279.275, société anonyme (No. FOSC 36 du 22.02.1993, p. 876).
Modification des statuts:
17.06.2014.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Société du Manège SA.
Nouvelle adresse:
Les Reussilles 28, 2722 Les Reussilles.
Nouveau but:
Construction et exploitation d'un manège et dépendance à Tramelan.
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux actionnaires: par lettre, téléfax ou courrier électronique.
Nouvelle restriction à la transmissibilité:
La transmissibilité des actions nominatives est limitée par les statuts. Selon déclaration du 17.06.2014, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Kohli, François, de Rüschegg, à Les Reussilles (Tramelan), président, avec signature individuelle;
Gunzinger, Willy, de Welschenrohr, à Tramelan, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle;
Société de Contrôle Fiduciaire S.A., à Bienne, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kohli, Catherine, de Rüschegg, à Tramelan, présidente, avec signature collective à deux;
Kohli, Priska, de Rüschegg, à Tramelan, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Kohli, Sandrine, de Rüschegg, à Tramelan, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Société du Manège S.A., à Tramelan (FOSC du 18.12.1956, no297, p.3215). Marc Nicolet, Roland Kohli étant décédés, Jean- Louis Aubry, Francis Vuilleumier, Roger Gagnebin ayant démissionné, leurs pouvoirs sont éteints. Ont été nommés François Kohli, de Rüschegg, à Les Reussilles/Tramelan, président;
Willy Gunzinger, de Rosières SO, à Tramelan, secrétaire;
tous deux avec signature individuelle.
Organe de contrôle:
Société de Contrôle Fiduciaire SA, à Bienne.
Nouvelle adresse:
rue de la Gare 7.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.