Reports for Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas
- Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Fribourg. Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas was founded on 25.11.1947.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.02.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas is registered in the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-107.756.513.
- Next to the organization Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas there are 5 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Fiduciaire Clément Barras S.A., FONDATION DE SOLIDARITE CHRETIENNE-SOCIALE DU CANTON DE FRIBOURG, SOGEST SA.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Dipl. Ing. André Paul Félix Schoenenweid,
Jean Marc Pache,
Vincent François Hayoz,
Clément Yves Barras,
Claude Joye
newest authorized signatories
Dipl. Ing. André Paul Félix Schoenenweid,
Vincent François Hayoz,
Claude Joye
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.11.1947
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Fribourg
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.150.040-9
UID/VAT
CHE-107.756.513
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La construction ou l'acquisition d'immeubles locatifs à loyers modérés, leur exploitation et location à l'usage de ses membres et de l'ensemble de la population. La société ne poursuit par de buts lucratifs (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PKF Fiduciaire SA, succursale de Fribourg | Fribourg | 07.07.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Wassmer S.A. | Fribourg | 05.03.2013 | 06.07.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005964510, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas, à Fribourg, CHE-107.756.513 (FOSC du 07.07.2023, p. 0/1005789927).
Personne radiée:
Lauper Marcel Jules, membre du comité, vice-président, signature collective à deux.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Schoenenweid André Paul Félix, membre du comité, sans signature, maintenant membre du comité, vice-président, signature collective à deux, désormais à Fribourg (fusion de commune).
Publication number: HR02-1005789927, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas, à Fribourg, CHE-107.756.513 (FOSC du 11.11.2022, p. 0/1005602374).
Personne radiée:
Fiduciaire Wassmer S.A (CH-217-0132140-4), organe de révision.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
PKF Fiduciaire SA, succursale de Fribourg (CHE-320.651.923), à Fribourg, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005602374, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société coopérative immobilière Sodalitas, à Fribourg, CHE-107.756.513 (FOSC du 24.01.2020, p. 0/1004813458).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Pache Jean-Marc, directeur, signature collective à deux, désormais membre du comité, sans signature.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Hayoz Vincent François, d'Ueberstorf, à Prez, directeur, signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.