Address
c/o Jean Bachmann
Rue Baptiste-Savoye 62
2610 St-Imier
Reports for Société coopérative FD-INFO
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative FD-INFO
- Société coopérative FD-INFO with its legal headquarters in St-Imier is active. Société coopérative FD-INFO operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The organization was founded on 16.01.1980.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 12.04.2023.
- The organization Société coopérative FD-INFO is registered under the UID CHE-102.229.904.
- Next to the organization Société coopérative FD-INFO there are 4 other active companies with an identical address. These include: DENNER Partenaire, Fehrat KARADAS, EdElla Sàrl, Le Phono C. Vaney.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.01.1980
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Saint-Imier
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.5.003.159-5
UID/VAT
CHE-102.229.904
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Edition d'un journal hebdomadaire destiné à promouvoir la vie politique, économique, culturelle et sociale du Jura bernois et de toute autre publication.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Coopérative FD - INFO
- FD-Info
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative FD-INFO
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005721384, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Coopérative FD - INFO, à Saint-Imier, CHE-102.229.904, société coopérative (No. FOSC 167 du 29.08.2012, p.0, Publ. 6826612).
Modification des statuts:
06.04.2022.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Société coopérative FD-INFO.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Jean Bachmann, Rue Baptiste-Savoye 62, 2610 St-Imier.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Houmard, Marc-André, de Champoz, à Malleray, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Mohni, Marcel, de Wynigen, à Bévilard, membre, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Benoit, Roland, de Romont (BE), à Corgémont, président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux];
Bühler, Lucien, de Sigriswil, à Tramelan, vice-président de l'administration, sans droit de signature;
Voutat, Roland, de Sorvilier, à Malleray (Valbirse), membre de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président].
Publication number: 6826612, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
FD - Info, à Saint-Imier, CH-073.5.003.159-5, société coopérative (No. FOSC 98 du 22.05.1995, p. 2849).
Modification des statuts:
05.05.2010.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Coopérative FD - INFO.
Nouvelle responsabilité/prestations supplémentaires:
[La mention relative à la responsabilité est radiée d'office conformément à l'art. 87 al. 1, let. j, ORC.] [biffé: Responsabilité/Versements supplémentaires : les associés sont exonérés de toute responsabilité quant aux engagements pris par la société, lesquels sont uniquements garantis par la fortune sociale.].Nouvelles obligations: Obligation de fournir des prestations: selon statuts. [précédemment: Obligations : chaque associé est tenu d'acquérir une part sociale.].Selon déclaration du 02.07.2011, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Favre, Henri-Louis, de Fenin-Vilars-Saules, à Tavannes, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Althaus, Francis, de Rüderswil, à Moutier, membre, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Benoit, Roland, de Romont BE, à Corgémont, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Mohni, Marcel, de Wynigen, à Bévilard, membre, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
F D ¬ Info, à St-Imier, édition d'un journal hebdomadaire, société coopérative (FOSC du 25.3.1991, no58, p.1233). Max Negri, André Ory, Josiane Aegerter, Marie-Josée Dornbierer-Iff, Alexandre Glauser et Heidi Wälchli ont démissionné, leurs pouvoirs sont éteints.
Sont nommés:
Henri-Louis Favre, de Fenin, Vilars, Saules, à Tavannes, président;
Marc-André Houmard, de Champoz, à Malleray, vice-président, tous deux avec signature collective à deux;
Roland Voutat, de Sorvillier, à Malleray, administrateur;
Francis Althaus, de Rüderswil, à Moutier, membre, tous deux avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.