Address
c/o Bernard Bettex
Route de la Gaîté 3
1536 Combremont-le-Petit
Reports for Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages'
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages'
- Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages' is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Combremont-le-Petit. Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages' belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- The management of the organization Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages' consists of 5 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 13.01.2020. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages' is registered under the UID CHE-101.846.230.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Michel Briod,
Andréas Baumgartner,
Jean-Luc Chambaz,
Lionel Correvon,
Stéphane Christinaz
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.12.1886
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Valbroye
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.167.710-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.846.230
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a notamment pour buts: de défendre les intérêts des ses membres, en particulier en matière de prix et de prise en charge du lait; de défendre les intérêts de ses membres au sein des Interprofessions; d'informer régulièrement ses membres; de favoriser le développement des techniques laitières.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société coopérative de fromagerie 'Les Trois Villages'
- Société de fromagerie "Les Trois Villages"
- Société de fromagerie Les Trois Villages
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages'
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004802974, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative de fromagerie "les Trois villages", à Valbroye, CHE-101.846.230 (FOSC du 11.09.2015, p. 0/2369425). Jordi Bruno et Coigny Etienne, dont la signature est radiée, ainsi que Bettex Bernard et Correvon Thierry, inscrits sans signature, ne sont plus administrateurs.
Nouveaux administrateurs:
Baumgartner Andreas, de Rapperswil (BE), à Valbroye, président, Briod Michel, de et à Lucens, secrétaire, tous deux avec signature collective à deux, Chambaz Jean-Luc, de Montanaire, à Valbroye, et Correvon Lionel, de et à Treytorrens (Payerne), les deux sans signature.
Publication number: 2369425, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages', à Valbroye, CHE-101.846.230 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
route de la Gaïté 3, c/o Bernard Bettex, 1536 Combremont-Petit. Bettex Gérald et Meige Jean-Marc ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Coigny Etienne est nommé secrétaire avec signature collective à deux. Bettex Bernard est désormais de et à Valbroye.
Nouveaux administrateurs avec signature collective à deux:
Jordi Bruno, de Gondiswil, à Treytorrens (Payerne), président, et Christinaz Stéphane, de Delley-Portalban, à Nuvilly, caissier.
Publication number: 7124252, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative de fromagerie 'les Trois villages', à Combremont-le-Petit, CH-550-0167710-1 (FOSC du 04.06.2010, p. 19/5661136). Par suite de fusion de communes, le siège devient Valbroye.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.