Reports for SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz)
- SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz) with its legal headquarters in Langenthal is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz) is active.
- The organization was founded on 21.07.2000.
- The last commercial register change was made on 02.08.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz) is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-109.660.278.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Jangsher Singh Masuta,
Vikramjit Singh,
Balraj Singh,
Ranjit Masuta,
Harminder Singh Khalsa
newest authorized signatories
Jangsher Singh Masuta,
Vikramjit Singh,
Balraj Singh,
Ranjit Masuta,
Harminder Singh Khalsa
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.07.2000
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Langenthal
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.7.014.853-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.660.278
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die religiöse Versorgung von Sikh-Religionsgemeinschaften und Glaubensgenossen, insbesondere die Förderung, Erhaltung und Pflege der Sikh-Religion und -Kultur in der Schweiz und im Ausland. Im Rahmen dieser Zweckbestimmung errichtet und betreibt die Stiftung Religions- und Kultuszentren in der Schweiz und kann Institutionen mit gleichem religiösem Zweck im Ausland unterstützen. Die Stiftung fördert Bildung, Unterricht und Erziehung der Sikh-Glaubensgenossen, trägt zur Information und Aufklärung der Bevölkerung und zum Abbau von Vorurteilen bei. Zudem betreibt die Stiftung Suchtprävention und Armenfürsorge und fördert soziale Kontakte und die Integration von Glaubensgenossen. Zur Erreichung des Stiftungszweckes sind die Erträgnisse des Stiftungsvermögens für religiöse, wohltätige und gemeinnützige Zwecke zu verwenden.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grevag AG | Langenthal | 21.08.2008 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
indigo immobilien ag | Langenthal | <2004 | 20.08.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SIS SIKH - Stifung Schweiz
- SIS SIKH - Stiftung Schweiz
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005808148, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz), in Langenthal, CHE-109.660.278, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2023, Publ. 1005777501).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Singh, Sukhminder, indischer Staatsangehöriger, in Binningen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Masuta, Jangsher Singh, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Binningen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005777501, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz), in Langenthal, CHE-109.660.278, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 16.10.2014, S.0, Publ. 1772289).
Urkundenänderung:
02.05.2023.
Zweck neu:
Die Stiftung bezweckt die religiöse Versorgung von Sikh-Religionsgemeinschaften und Glaubensgenossen, insbesondere die Förderung, Erhaltung und Pflege der Sikh-Religion und -Kultur in der Schweiz und im Ausland. Im Rahmen dieser Zweckbestimmung errichtet und betreibt die Stiftung Religions- und Kultuszentren in der Schweiz und kann Institutionen mit gleichem religiösem Zweck im Ausland unterstützen. Die Stiftung fördert Bildung, Unterricht und Erziehung der Sikh-Glaubensgenossen, trägt zur Information und Aufklärung der Bevölkerung und zum Abbau von Vorurteilen bei. Zudem betreibt die Stiftung Suchtprävention und Armenfürsorge und fördert soziale Kontakte und die Integration von Glaubensgenossen. Zur Erreichung des Stiftungszweckes sind die Erträgnisse des Stiftungsvermögens für religiöse, wohltätige und gemeinnützige Zwecke zu verwenden.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Singh, Karan, indischer Staatsangehöriger, in Schlieren, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Singh Khalsa, Harminder, indischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, Sekretär des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Masuta, Ranjit, von Basel, in Binningen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Singh, Balraj, indischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Singh, Sukhminder, indischer Staatsangehöriger, in Binningen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Singh, Vikramjit, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Pegognaga (IT), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassier des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1772289, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SIS SIKH - Stiftung (Schweiz), in Langenthal, CHE-109.660.278, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 20.01.2011, S. 5, Publ. 5994826).
Organisation neu:
[Streichung der Organisation von Amtes wegen, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grevag AG (CHE-112.530.452), in Langenthal, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Grevag AG (CH-053.3.017.432-8)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.