Address
c/o Erwin Frei
Chraibelstrasse 26
5027 Herznach
Branches (1)
Reports for SIDAK GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SIDAK GmbH
- SIDAK GmbH has its legal headquarters in Herznach, is active and operates in the sector «Guard and security services».
- SIDAK GmbH was founded on 24.03.1999.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.05.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.969.079.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.03.1999
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Herznach-Ueken
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.020.362-2
UID/VAT
CHE-103.969.079
Sector
Guard and security services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Sicherheitsdienstleistungen aller Art, wie Be- und Überwachungen, Verkehrsdienst, Werttransporte und Personenschutz; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner | Schwyz | 09.02.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SIDAK Sicherheitsdienste Alfred Klaus GmbH
- SIDAK Sicherheitsdienste Klaus Alfred GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SIDAK GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006035916, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SIDAK GmbH, in Herznach-Ueken, CHE-103.969.079, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2023, Publ. 1005664818).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Heinrich, von Niederhasli, in Oberglatt, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schilter, Dominik, von Arth, in Wollerau, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schilter, Thomas, von Arth, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schilter, Theodor, von Arth, in Schwyz, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005664818, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SIDAK GmbH, in Herznach, CHE-103.969.079, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2022, Publ. 1005546754).
Sitz neu:
Herznach-Ueken. [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2023].
Publication number: HR02-1005546754, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SIDAK GmbH, in Herznach, CHE-103.969.079, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 24.03.2020, Publ. 1004859138).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schilter, Dominik, von Arth, in Wollerau, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schilter, Thomas, von Arth, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.