Reports for SERVI TEC GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SERVI TEC GmbH
- SERVI TEC GmbH in Gelterkinden is a Limited liability company from the sector «Trading in household appliances and related goods». SERVI TEC GmbH is active.
- The company was founded on 06.04.1998 and has 2 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 04.08.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BL under the UID CHE-104.457.416.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: GRG Holding Group AG, GRG Ingenieure AG, irema ag.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.04.1998
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Gelterkinden
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.4.001.235-1
UID/VAT
CHE-104.457.416
Sector
Trading in household appliances and related goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Dienstleistungen und Service für Elektrogeräte sowie Ausführungen von Elektroinstallationen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SERVI TEC Lausen GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SERVI TEC GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005534997, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
SERVI TEC Lausen GmbH, in Lausen, CHE-104.457.416, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2019, Publ. 1004566560).
Statutenänderung:
14.07.2022.
Firma neu:
SERVI TEC GmbH.
Sitz neu:
Gelterkinden.
Domizil neu:
Keltenweg 31, 4460 Gelterkinden.
Zweck neu:
Dienstleistungen und Service für Elektrogeräte sowie Ausführungen von Elektroinstallationen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grieder, Tobias, von Rünenberg, in Rünenberg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 9'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00];
Grieder, Christine Maria, von Rünenberg, in Rünenberg, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Grieder-Herzig, Christine, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 9'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004566560, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
SERVI TEC Lausen GmbH, in Lausen, CHE-104.457.416, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 06.04.2016, S.0, Publ. 2762985).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schifferle, Urs, von Döttingen, in Bubendorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00 und mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 9'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grieder, Tobias, von Rünenberg, in Rünenberg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 9'000.00;
Grieder-Herzig, Christine, von Rünenberg, in Rünenberg, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 9'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.