Reports for GRG Ingenieure AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GRG Ingenieure AG
- GRG Ingenieure AG with its legal headquarters in Gelterkinden is active. GRG Ingenieure AG operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company GRG Ingenieure AG, which was founded on the 29.01.1979, consists of 5 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 23.06.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company GRG Ingenieure AG is registered under the UID CHE-105.827.881.
- On the same address as GRG Ingenieure AG there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: GRG Holding Group AG, irema ag, SERVI TEC GmbH.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Beat Schweizer,
Marc Strub,
Priska Sutter,
Peter Kiegler,
Erich Martin Geiser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.01.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Gelterkinden
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.915.751-0
UID/VAT
CHE-105.827.881
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Ingenieurbüros. Die Gesellschaft kann sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Duttweiler & Partner Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Liestal | 13.03.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schneeberger Treuhand AG | Thürnen | 02.08.2016 | 12.03.2019 | |
DATO-Treuhand AG | Basel | <2004 | 01.08.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GRG Ingenieure AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005776621, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
GRG Ingenieure AG, in Gelterkinden, CHE-105.827.881, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 21.08.2020, Publ. 1004962507).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mesmer, Jürg, von Muttenz, in Lampenberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004962507, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
GRG Ingenieure AG, in Gelterkinden, CHE-105.827.881, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 18.11.2019, Publ. 1004761548).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schweizer, Beat, von Arboldswil, in Oberdorf (BL), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Strub, Marc, von Läufelfingen, in Läufelfingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sutter, Priska, von Zeglingen, in Lampenberg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004761548, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
GRG Ingenieure AG, in Gelterkinden, CHE-105.827.881, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2019, Publ. 1004586643).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gattlen, Michèle, von Bürchen, in Känerkinden, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.