Address
c/o Sena Plastics AG
Industriestrasse 101
4147 Aesch BL
Reports for Sena Plastics Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sena Plastics Holding AG
- Sena Plastics Holding AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Aesch BL. Sena Plastics Holding AG belongs to the industry «Operation of investment companies» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Sena Plastics Holding AG, which was founded on the 14.07.2015, consists of 3 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 03.07.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Sena Plastics Holding AG is the following: CHE-410.494.686.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Serge Naegelin,
Martin Bruno Helfenstein-Ammann,
Philipp Aebin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.07.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.019.171-1
UID/VAT
CHE-410.494.686
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Vermögenswerten und Beteiligungen an Unternehmen jeder Art im In- und Ausland sowie den Erwerb von Grundstücken und Immobilien, soweit dies nicht der Bewilligungspflicht des Bundesgesetzes über den Erwerb von Grundstücken durch Personen im Ausland untersteht. Die Gesellschaft kann Finanzierungsgeschäfte abwickeln.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sena Plastics Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005784629, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Sena Plastics Holding AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-410.494.686, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 14.05.2018, Publ. 4226429).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Crevoisier, Christine Luise, von Basel, in Ettingen, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aebin, Philipp, von Muttenz, in Arboldswil, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4226429, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Sena Plastics Holding AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-410.494.686, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2015, Publ. 2274867).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aebin, Philipp, von Muttenz, in Arboldswil, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nägelin, Serge, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hirtzfelden (FR), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Crevoisier, Christine Luise, von Basel, in Ettingen, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2274867, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Sena Plastics Holding AG, in Aesch BL, CHE-410.494.686, c/o Sena Plastics AG, Industriestrasse 101, 4147 Aesch BL, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
13.07.2015.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Vermögenswerten und Beteiligungen an Unternehmen jeder Art im In- und Ausland sowie den Erwerb von Grundstücken und Immobilien, soweit dies nicht der Bewilligungspflicht des Bundesgesetzes über den Erwerb von Grundstücken durch Personen im Ausland untersteht. Die Gesellschaft kann Finanzierungsgeschäfte abwickeln.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 200'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 200'000.00.
Aktien:
200 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 13.07.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Nägelin, Serge, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hirtzfelden (FR), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Helfenstein, Martin, von Sempach, in Titterten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aebin, Philipp, von Muttenz, in Arboldswil, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.