Reports for Seculting SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Seculting SA
- Seculting SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Orbe. Seculting SA belongs to the industry «IT services» and is currently active.
- Seculting SA has one person entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 29.07.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-326.028.728.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.01.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Orbe
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.164.788-8
UID/VAT
CHE-326.028.728
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la conception, l'implémentation et la distribution de produits et services concernant l'informatique, en particulier les solutions de sauvegarde, la sécurité et l'implémentation de solutions métiers (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Seculting Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Seculting SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005532441, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Seculting SA, à Orbe, CHE-326.028.728 (FOSC du 27.11.2017, p. 0/3894207). Marclay David n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Frey Nicolas n'est plus président.
Publication number: 3894207, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Seculting Sàrl, à Orbe, CHE-326.028.728 (FOSC du 12.01.2016, p. 0/2590857). Augmentation du capital social.
Nouveau capital social:
CHF 100'000, divisé en 1'000 parts de CHF 100, dont Frey Nicolas est titulaire.
Transformation:
la société à responsabilité limitée Seculting Sàrl est transformée en société anonyme conformément au projet de transformation du 9 novembre 2017 et bilan au 30 juin 2017, présentant des actifs de CHF 68'207.89 et des passifs envers les tiers de CHF 47'891.28, soit un actif net de CHF 20'316.61, contre attribution à l'associé de 1'000 actions de CHF 100.
Nouvelle forme de droit:
société anonyme. Statuts modifiés le 9 novembre 2017.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Seculting SA.
Capital-actions entièrement libéré:
100'000, divisé en 1'000 d'actions nominatives de CHF 100, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts. La clause statutaire relative à l'obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption est radiée.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Frey Nicolas, qui n'est plus gérant, est nommé administrateur et président avec signature individuelle.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature collective à deux:
Marclay David, de et à Monthey.
Publication number: 2590857, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Seculting Sàrl, à Orbe, rue des Ducats 40 B, 1350 Orbe, CHE-326.028.728. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
9 décembre 2015.
But:
la société a pour but la conception, l'implémentation et la distribution de produits et services concernant l'informatique, en particulier les solutions de sauvegarde, la sécurité et l'implémentation de solutions métiers (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.
Associé-gérant avec signature individuelle:
Frey Nicolas, de Vevey, à Orbe, avec 200 parts de CHF 100.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 9 décembre 2015, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.