Reports for Schaller SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schaller SA
- Schaller SA in Forel (Lavaux) is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with machines». Schaller SA is active.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 28.07.1958.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 28.11.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-105.958.750.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.07.1958
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Forel (Lavaux)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.129.360-6
UID/VAT
CHE-105.958.750
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, représentation exclusive et vente de toutes machines de chantier pour entreprises de génie civil et de construction métallique ainsi que l'exploitation d'un atelier d'entretien.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Favre Révision SA | Lausanne | 12.08.2010 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Michel Favre SA | Lausanne | 14.07.2006 | 11.08.2010 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | <2004 | 13.07.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schaller SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005895942, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Schaller S.A., à Forel (Lavaux), CHE-105.958.750 (FOSC du 19.07.2019, p. 0/1004680388). L'autre adresse Grenzweg 12, Schöftland, est radiée.
Nouvelle autre adresse:
Matt 3, 5046 Schmiedrued.
Publication number: HR02-1004680388, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Schaller S.A., à Forel (Lavaux), CHE-105.958.750 (FOSC du 20.07.2018, p. 0/4373329). La procuration de Dohr Sarah et Jaques Muriel est éteinte.
Publication number: 4373329, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Schaller S.A., à Forel (Lavaux), CHE-105.958.750 (FOSC du 24.06.2014, p. 0/1570903). Procuration collective à deux est conférée à Dohr Sarah, d'Urnäsch, à Vevey, et Jaques Muriel, de Lutry, à Savigny.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.