Reports for Scemama SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Scemama SA
- Scemama SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Biel/Bienne. Scemama SA belongs to the industry «Trading with machines» and is currently active.
- Scemama SA has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 05.09.2017. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.182.405.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.01.1945
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.002.163-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.182.405
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'achat, la fabrication et la vente d'outils et machines de précision, leur réparation et toutes représentations d'articles similaires; l'achat, la vente et la gérance d'immeuble. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou fonder des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directemet ou indirectement.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Fidac S.A., Bienne | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 22.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Scemama AG
- SCEMAMA SA
- Scemama Maurice SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Scemama SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3733001, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Scemama SA, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-107.182.405, société anonyme (No. FOSC 148 du 03.08.2017, Publ. 3678751).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Stolz, Patrick, de Kirchberg (SG), à Biel/Bienne, avec procuration collective à deux avec Michel Scemama.
Publication number: 3678751, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Scemama SA, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-107.182.405, société anonyme (No. FOSC 119 du 23.06.2010, Publ. 5688962).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Scemama, Michel, de Bulle, à Le Landeron, administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Scemama, David, de Bulle, à Nods, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Scemama, Jérôme, de Bulle, à Le Landeron, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 5688962, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SCEMAMA SA, à Biel/Bienne, CH-073.3.002.163-6, société anonyme (No. FOSC 52 du 14.03.2000, p. 1715).
Modification des statuts:
23.06.2009.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Scemama SA.
Nouvelle traduction de la raison:
(Scemama AG).
Nouveau but:
La société a pour but: l'achat, la fabrication et la vente d'outils et machines de précision, leur réparation et toutes représentations d'articles similaires;
l'achat, la vente et la gérance d'immeuble. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou fonder des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directemet ou indirectement.
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux actionnaires: par lettre, téléfax ou courrier électronique. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 23.06.2009, la société n'est pas soumise au contrôle ordinaire et renonce au contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Schulze, Bernd, ressortissant autrichien, à Ipsach, avec procuration collective à deux avec Michel Scemama;
Fiduciaire Fidac S.A. Bienne, à Bienne, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.