Address
c/o Bruno von Allmen
Brunnen 994E, Chalet Gletscherhorn
3825 Mürren
Reports for Salfra Baugewerbe AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Salfra Baugewerbe AG
- Salfra Baugewerbe AG in Mürren is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Salfra Baugewerbe AG is active.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 30.04.1985.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 24.07.2023.
- The reported UID is CHE-100.583.878.
Management (6)
newest board members
Urs Raaflaub,
Bruno von Allmen,
Hans Otto von Allmen,
Hansruedi Feuz,
Karl Sigrist-Wyss
newest authorized signatories
Urs Raaflaub,
Bruno von Allmen,
Hans Otto von Allmen,
Marc Daniel Hagmann,
Hansruedi Feuz
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.04.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lauterbrunnen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.007.377-1
UID/VAT
CHE-100.583.878
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Erwerb, der Verkauf und die Vermittlung von Grundstücken, sowie die Erstellung und Verwaltung von Bauten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Baurechte einräumen oder als Baurechtsberechtigte Grundstücke überbauen und sich an Baukonsortien beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen. Ausserdem kann sie alle Massnahmen treffen und alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszieles zu fördern oder zu erleichtern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hagmann Treuhand AG | Bern | <2004 | 08.12.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Salfra Baugewerbe AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005802146, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Salfra Baugewerbe AG, in Lauterbrunnen, CHE-100.583.878, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2021, Publ. 1005319900).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Linder, Hanni Jolanda, von Lauterbrunnen, in Mürren (Lauterbrunnen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Allmen, Hans Otto, von Lauterbrunnen, in Interlaken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Mürren (Lauterbrunnen)].
Publication number: HR02-1005319900, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Salfra Baugewerbe AG, in Lauterbrunnen, CHE-100.583.878, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 29.12.2020, Publ. 1005060740).
Domizil neu:
c/o Bruno von Allmen, Chalet Gletscherhorn, Brunnen 994E, 3825 Mürren.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Allmen, Bruno, von Lauterbrunnen, in Mürren (Lauterbrunnen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Raaflaub, Urs, von Bern und Saanen, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Feuz, Hansruedi, von Lauterbrunnen, in Goldswil b. Interlaken (Ringgenberg (BE)), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Feuz, Hans Rudolf, in Mürren (Lauterbrunnen)];
Sigrist, Karl, von Sarnen, in Mürren (Lauterbrunnen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Sigrist, Karl jun.];
von Allmen, Hans Otto, von Lauterbrunnen, in Mürren (Lauterbrunnen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005060740, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Salfra Baugewerbe AG, in Lauterbrunnen, CHE-100.583.878, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 09.12.2020, Publ. 1005042936).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hagmann, Marc Daniel, von Bern, in Bern, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.