Address
Othmarsingerstrasse 50
5604 Hendschiken
Reports for Rüebliland AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rüebliland AG
- Rüebliland AG is active in the industry «Production of bread and pastry» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Hendschiken.
- Rüebliland AG has 7 persons entered in its management.
- On the 26.04.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AG is CHE-102.713.672.
Management (7)
newest board members
Stefanie Geiser,
Stephan Stulz Messerschmidt,
Raphael Süess,
Jakob Gebhard,
Andreas Vogel
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Philipp Amrein,
Hanspeter Dick,
Stephan Stulz Messerschmidt,
Raphael Süess,
Andreas Vogel
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.06.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hendschiken
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.018.492-7
UID/VAT
CHE-102.713.672
Sector
Production of bread and pastry
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Produktion und Vertrieb von Lebensmitteln, Brot- und Backwaren und Artikeln des täglichen Bedarfs; die Gesellschaft kann national wie auch international Filialen gründen, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 16.05.2017 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 08.01.2016 | 15.05.2017 | |
Truvag Revisions AG | Sursee | <2004 | 07.01.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rüebliland AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005458642, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Rüebliland AG, in Hendschiken, CHE-102.713.672, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 13.01.2022, Publ. 1005380275).
Statutenänderung:
06.04.2022.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'000'000.00 [bisher: CHF 500'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'000'000.00 [bisher: CHF 500'000.00].
Aktien neu:
1'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 500 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Ordentliche Kapitalerhöhung vom 06.04.2022.
Publication number: HR02-1005380275, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Rüebliland AG, in Hendschiken, CHE-102.713.672, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 27.03.2019, Publ. 1004597111).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geiser, Stefanie, von Langenthal, in Windisch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004597111, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Rüebliland AG, in Hendschiken, CHE-102.713.672, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 16.05.2017, Publ. 3524681).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bucher, Josef, von Escholzmatt, in Dottikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Amrein, Philipp, von Sempach, in Hendschiken, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dick, Hanspeter, von Safnern, in Rupperswil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.