Reports for Rüdiger AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rüdiger AG
- Rüdiger AG in St. Gallen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Rüdiger AG is active.
- The management of the company Rüdiger AG, which was founded on the 01.05.1924, consists of 6 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 13.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.267.964.
- There are 5 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: ERNST CHRISTIAN GmbH, Gallus Druck GmbH, la verità st.gallen kuhn.
Management (6)
newest board members
Michael John Rüdiger Trionfini,
Tim Rüdiger,
Franziska Engel-Rüdiger,
Leo Rüdiger,
Thomas Rüdiger
newest authorized signatories
Michael John Rüdiger Trionfini,
Tim Rüdiger,
Franziska Engel-Rüdiger,
Leo Rüdiger,
Georg Rüdiger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.05.1924
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.018.786-3
UID/VAT
CHE-107.267.964
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Verwaltung, Bewirtschaftung, Vermittlung, Veräusserung, Erstellung und das Halten sowie Vermieten von Liegenschaften und das Durchführen von Immobilienberatung als auch die Vermögensverwaltung. Die Gesellschaft kann darüber hinaus Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bonfida Treuhand AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 12.07.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rüdiger AG, Buch- und Offsetdruck
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rüdiger AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006030351, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rüdiger AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-107.267.964, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 17.12.2021, Publ. 1005360344).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rüdiger, Martin, von St. Gallen, in Reitnau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüdiger, Tim, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Engel-Rüdiger, Franziska;
Rüdiger Trionfini, Michael John, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Rüdiger, Leo.
Publication number: HR02-1005360344, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rüdiger AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-107.267.964, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 03.09.2019, Publ. 1004708061).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüdiger, Martin, von St. Gallen, in Reitnau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Rüdiger, Georg];
Engel-Rüdiger, Franziska, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüdiger, Leo, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüdiger, Thomas, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Rüdiger, Georg];
Rüdiger, Georg, von St. Gallen, in Arnegg (Gossau (SG)), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004708061, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Rüdiger AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-107.267.964, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 13.07.2009, S.22, Publ. 5133840).
Statutenänderung:
21.08.2019.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Verwaltung, Bewirtschaftung, Vermittlung, Veräusserung, Erstellung und das Halten sowie Vermieten von Liegenschaften und das Durchführen von Immobilienberatung als auch die Vermögensverwaltung. Die Gesellschaft kann darüber hinaus Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rüdiger-Schindler, Eugen, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüdiger, Martin, von St. Gallen, in Reitnau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Rüdiger, Georg [bisher: Rüdiger-Iseli, Martin, Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Rüdiger, Thomas, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Rüdiger, Georg;
Rüdiger, Georg, von St. Gallen, in Arnegg (Gossau (SG)), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Rüdiger-Harper, Georg, in St. Gallen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift]. [Anpassung der Funktionen aufgrund geänderter Eintragungspraxis.]
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.