Reports for Rofra Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rofra Holding AG
- Rofra Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Aesch BL is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Business management and administration». Rofra Holding AG is active.
- The management of the company Rofra Holding AG, which was founded on the 03.06.2010, consists of 5 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 21.12.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company Rofra Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-115.730.007.
- There are 6 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Andlau Park AG, Birspark AG, Rofra Bau AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Christian Hamann,
lic. oec. Christoph Patrick Buser,
Remo Franz-Guthauser
newest authorized signatories
Christian Hamann,
Stephan Hug,
lic. oec. Christoph Patrick Buser,
Remo Franz-Guthauser,
Martha Franz-Guthauser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.06.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.013.772-8
UID/VAT
CHE-115.730.007
CHE-462.413.235 VAT
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten, Verwalten und Verwerten von Beteiligungen. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner Liegenschaften halten, verwalten und verwerten, Hilfsunternehmen und Filialunternehmen gründen, Betriebsstätten errichten und sich an anderen kommerziellen und industriellen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG | Basel | 21.12.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung | Basel | 09.06.2010 | 20.12.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rofra Bau AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rofra Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005917210, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Holding AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-115.730.007, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2023, Publ. 1005700998).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung (CHE-105.815.004), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG (CHE-101.859.215), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005700998, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Holding AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-115.730.007, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 17.02.2023, Publ. 1005681433).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cron, Raymond, von Basel, in Binningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005681433, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Holding AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-115.730.007, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2022, Publ. 1005484175).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Franz, Alfred genannt Fredy, von Liesberg, in Pfeffingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hamann, Christian, von Münchenstein, in Aesch (BL), Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Pfeffingen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.