Branches (1)
Reports for Rofra Bau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rofra Bau AG
- Rofra Bau AG from Aesch BL operates in the sector «General structural engineering» and is active.
- The management of the company Rofra Bau AG, which was founded on the 17.06.2010, consists of 9 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.12.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-115.762.289.
- Next to the company Rofra Bau AG there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Andlau Park AG, Birspark AG, Rofra Baumanagement AG.
Management (9)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Christian Hamann,
Stephan Hug,
Benjamin Paul Ebler,
Rolf Seeholzer,
Steffen Stein
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.06.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.013.806-6
UID/VAT
CHE-115.762.289
CHE-462.413.235 VAT
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Baugeschäfts sowie die Erbringung aller damit zusammenhängenden Leistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen betreiben, Liegenschaften erwerben und verkaufen sowie sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG | Basel | 21.12.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung | Basel | 23.06.2010 | 20.12.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rofra Bau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005917208, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Bau AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-115.762.289, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2023, Publ. 1005700996).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung (CHE-105.815.004), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG (CHE-101.859.215), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005700996, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Bau AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-115.762.289, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2022, Publ. 1005384563).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Franz, Alfred genannt Fredy, von Liesberg, in Pfeffingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hamann, Christian, von Münchenstein, in Aesch (BL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Pfeffingen, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Seeholzer, Rolf, von Feusisberg, in Binningen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005384563, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Rofra Bau AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-115.762.289, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 08.10.2021, Publ. 1005308376).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hug, Stephan, von Jaberg, in Muespach le Haut (FR), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.