Reports for Restaurant & Event AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Restaurant & Event AG
- Restaurant & Event AG in Sitterdorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of restaurants». Restaurant & Event AG is active.
- The management of the company Restaurant & Event AG consists of 3 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 09.11.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-103.060.269.
- Next to the company Restaurant & Event AG there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: E. Berner AG, Flugplatz Sitterdorf Holding AG, Heli Sitterdorf AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.04.1925
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.002.500-9
UID/VAT
CHE-103.060.269
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Gastronomie- und Eventbereich sowie von Betriebsführungen und Verwaltungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Brunner & Schär Treuhand AG | Aadorf | 05.11.2013 | 01.10.2020 | |
inspecta experts ag | St. Gallen | <2004 | 15.02.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Bruno Berner AG
- Berner Bruno AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Restaurant & Event AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005881208, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Restaurant & Event AG, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-103.060.269, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 16.12.2021, Publ. 1005359236).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hefel, Willi, von Elsau, in Rickenbach Sulz (Rickenbach (ZH)), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Schönenberg an der Thur (Kradolf-Schönenberg)].
Publication number: HR02-1005359236, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Restaurant & Event AG, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-103.060.269, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 02.10.2020, Publ. 1004991491).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Holdener, Manfred, von Glarus, in Thal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004991491, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Restaurant & Event AG, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-103.060.269, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2018, Publ. 1004525224). Die Gesellschaft hat mit Erklärung vom 25.09.2020 auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brunner & Schär Treuhand AG (CH-440.3.002.052-8), in Aadorf, Revisionsstelle;
Hefel, Edith, von Oberuzwil, in Busswil TG (Sirnach), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holdener, Manfred, von Glarus, in Thal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.