Reports for René Isler
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout René Isler
- René Isler has its legal headquarters in Wohlen AG and is active. It is a Sole proprietorship and active in the industry «Other construction».
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 02.08.2013. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- René Isler is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-106.346.822.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.09.1988
Legal form
Sole proprietorship
Legal headquarters of the company
Wohlen (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.2.009.341-5
UID/VAT
CHE-106.346.822
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Spenglerei, Flachdach- und Blitzschutzanlagen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- V. + R. Isler
- Isler V. + R.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: René Isler
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1009901, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
V. + R. Isler, in Wohlen AG, CHE-106.346.822, Kollektivgesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 09.06.1992, S. 2635).
Rechtsform neu:
Einzelunternehmen.
Firma neu:
René Isler. Die Gesellschaft hat sich infolge Ausscheidens des Gesellschafters Viktor Isler aufgelöst. Die Gesellschaft ist erloschen. Der Inhaber René Isler führt im Sinne von Art. 579 OR das Geschäft als Einzelunternehmen weiter.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Isler, Viktor, von Wohlen, in Niederwil, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Isler, René, von Wohlen AG, in Waltenschwil, Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Wohlen, in Wohlen, Gesellschafter mit Einzelunterschrift].
Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
V. + R. Isler, in Wohlen , Kollektivgesellschaft, Spenglerei usw. (SHAB Nr.218 vom 19.9.1988, S.3828).
Geschäftsadresse nun:
Lägernstrasse13.
Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
V. + R. Isler, in Wohlen , Bifangstrasse 18, Kollektivgesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Beginn:
1.7.1988. Viktor Isler, von Wohlen AG, in Niederwil AG, und René Isler, von und in Wohlen AG. Spenglerei, Flachdach- und Blitzschutzanlagen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.