Address
c/o Toni Niederberger Treuhand AG
Geissmattstrasse 46
6002 Luzern
Reports for QCE AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout QCE AG
- QCE AG is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- QCE AG was founded on 23.04.2004.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 30.06.2017.
- The company is registered in the commercial register LU under the UID CHE-110.633.495.
- On the same address as QCE AG there are 6 other active companies registered. These include: ENSOLCON GmbH, Ewald Kaiser & Partner GmbH, IBB Projektconsult GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.04.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.028.041-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.633.495
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Technische Beratung im Bereich Bau und Industrie, insbesondere Qualitäts- und Werkstoffprüfung, Bauüberwachung und Planung von Industrieanlagen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Verkauf und Belastung von Grundstücken.
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: QCE AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3613785, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
QCE AG, in Luzern, CHE-110.633.495, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2011, Publ. 6473718).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kurnaz, Afacan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Mülheim an der Ruhr (DE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien gemäss OR 459 Absatz 2.
Publication number: 6473718, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
QCE GmbH, in Luzern, CH-100.4.028.041-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6350978).
Statuten neu:
14.12.2011.
Rechtsform neu:
Aktiengesellschaft.
Umwandlung:
Die Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung hat das Stammkapital durch Umwandlung von frei verfügbarem Eigenkapital auf CHF 100'000.00 erhöht und wird gemäss Umwandlungsplan vom 14.12.2011 und Bilanz per 30.06.2011 mit Aktiven von CHF 1'010'973.32 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 527'325.30 in eine Aktiengesellschaft umgewandelt. Die Gesellschafter erhalten für ihre bisherigen Stammanteile 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Firma neu:
QCE AG.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: Stammkapital CHF 20'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien neu:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 19.09.2011 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [bisher: Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 19.09.2011 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.]. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Benz, Karl-Heinz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Mülheim an der Ruhr (DE), Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Geschäftsführer;
Wojciak, Bernhard Siegfried, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rheinberg (DE), Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Geschäftsführer.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Toni, von Dallenwil, in Engelberg, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Dallenwil, Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 6350978, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
QCE GmbH, in Luzern, CH-100.4.028.041-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 20.09.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6341844).
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen brieflich. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 19.09.2011 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.