Reports for Prismafin SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Prismafin SA
- Prismafin SA has its legal headquarters in Zürich, is active and operates in the sector «Fund management».
- The management of the company Prismafin SA consists of 0 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 27.01.1994.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 24.02.2011. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Prismafin SA is the following: CHE-149.199.771.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: 8 Holding SA, Clarion Finanz AG, Job 3000 AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.01.1994
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.9.000.349-3
UID/VAT
CHE-149.199.771
CHE-105.737.775 VAT
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La gestione di patrimoni; la consulenza e l'esecuzione di operazioni finanziarie, di investimenti e di partecipazione; l'assistenza in operazioni di marketing; l'esecuzione di studi e ricerche di mercato; la promozione di iniziative finanziarie, commerciali, industriali e immobiliari, nonché la relativa consulenza ed assistenza tecnica ed operativa; la prestazione di servizi di programmazione finanziaria e di servizi di informazione nel settore finanziario e patrimoniale, nonché la rappresentanza e commercializzazione dei relativi mezzi di trasmissione; l'acquisto, la vendita, l'amministrazione e gestione di titoli, valori e beni mobiliari e immobiliari.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Prismafin SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6047362, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Prismafin SA, in Zürich, CH-020.9.000.349-3, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2011, S. 25, Publ. 6033096).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Chiasso.
Domizil neu:
Usteristrasse 9, 8001 Zürich .
Publication number: 6033096, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Prismafin SA, in Zürich, CH-020.9.000.349-3, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 07.02.2005, S. 24, Publ. 2689244).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Chiasso.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CH-524.3.003.854-6.
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Roland Limacher, von Schüpfheim, in Wädenswil scheidet als Direktor mit Einzelunterschrift aus. Weitere gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Poma, Giuseppe, von Mendrisio, in Mendrisio, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Limacher, Roland, von Schüpfheim, in Wädenswil, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Doninelli, Ugo, von Morbio Superiore, in Balerna, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2689244, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Prismafin SA, in Zürich, CH-020.9.000.349-3, Verwaltung von Vermögen, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 27.09.2000, S. 6601).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Chiasso.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pagani, Gian Mario, von Morbio Superiore, in Balerna, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Doninelli, Ugo, von Morbio Superiore, in Balerna, Präsident und Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Delegierter].