Reports for Petan Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Petan Immobilien AG
- Petan Immobilien AG is active in the industry «Facility management» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Stansstad.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 17.12.2007.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 01.04.2020, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Petan Immobilien AG is registered in the Canton of NW under the UID CHE-113.990.017.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Stansstad
Commercial Registry Office
NW
Commercial register number
CH-150.3.003.174-5
UID/VAT
CHE-113.990.017
Sector
Facility management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, Verkauf und die Verwaltung von Immobilien sowie das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in Zusammenhang mit Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke, Lizenzen und Patente erwerben, halten und veräussern, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten sowie alle Handlungen vornehmen, die geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lohri & Partner Treuhand GmbH | Adligenswil | 01.04.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Industrial Development Service AG | Horw | 21.12.2007 | 31.03.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Petan Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004863613, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Petan Immobilien AG, in Stansstad, CHE-113.990.017, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2018, Publ. 4107901).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peter-Kaufmann, Martha, von Horw, in Stansstad, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Industrial Development Service AG (CHE-102.678.018), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lohri & Partner Treuhand GmbH (CHE-107.416.253), in Adligenswil, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4107901, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Petan Immobilien AG, in Stansstad, CHE-113.990.017, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2007, Publ. 4258566).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Peter, Markus, von Horw, in Ennetbürgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Industrial Development Service AG (CHE-102.678.018), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Industrial Development Service AG].
Publication number: 4258566, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Petan Immobilien AG, in Stansstad, CH-150.3.003.174-5, Dorfplatz 12, 6362 Stansstad, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
12.12.2007.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, Verkauf und die Verwaltung von Immobilien sowie das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in Zusammenhang mit Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke, Lizenzen und Patente erwerben, halten und veräussern, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten sowie alle Handlungen vornehmen, die geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 2'000'000.--.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 2'000'000.--.
Aktien:
2'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.--.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss Verträgen vom 12.12.2007 die Grundstücke Nr. 1301, Grundbuch Stans, Nr. 513 Grundbuch Stansstad, Nr. 1023 Grundbuch Ennetbürgen sowie die Grundstücke Nr. 76 und Nr. 218, beide Grundbuch Horw, wofür 2'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 4'890'000.-- als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Peter-Kaufmann, Anton, von Horw, in Stansstad, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Peter-Kaufmann, Martha, von Horw, in Stansstad, Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Industrial Development Service AG, in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.