Reports for Perseverantia SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Perseverantia SA
- Perseverantia SA with its legal headquarters in Stans is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Perseverantia SA is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 03.04.1984.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 04.12.2019.
- The reported UID is CHE-100.260.530.
- There are 63 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: 224 Rooms Productions GmbH, abante GmbH, Achernar Assets AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Luca Rinaldo Contardo Padulli,
Antoine Théodore André Berthoud,
Yves Henri Gérard Brüderlein
newest authorized signatories
Luca Rinaldo Contardo Padulli,
Antoine Théodore André Berthoud,
Yves Henri Gérard Brüderlein
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.04.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Stans
Commercial Registry Office
NW
Commercial register number
CH-150.3.000.461-0
UID/VAT
CHE-100.260.530
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Übernahme von Beteiligungen an Gesellschaften in der Schweiz und im Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann alle mit diesem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehenden Finanzierungs- und Verwaltungshandlungen, wie Kapitalzuführung, kurz- oder langfristige Kredite und Lizenzvergaben, ausführen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 02.02.2015 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rivafid, société fiduciaire SA | Genève | 03.10.2011 | 01.02.2015 | |
ACF FIDUCIAIRE SA | Genève | <2004 | 02.10.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Perseverantia SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004774452, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Perseverantia SA, in Stans, CHE-100.260.530, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 02.02.2015, S.0, Publ. 1965113).
Domizil neu:
Alter Postplatz 2, 6370 Stans.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brüderlein, Yves, von Coppet, in Ennetbürgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Bruderlein, Yves, von Genf, in Coppet].
Publication number: 1965113, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Perseverantia SA, in Stans, CHE-100.260.530, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 24.09.2012, Publ. 6860350).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rivafid, société fiduciaire SA (CH-660.1.058.997-6), in Genf, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-491.907.686), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6860350, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Perseverantia SA, in Stans, CH-150.3.000.461-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 16.03.2012, Publ. 6597606).
Domizil neu:
Alter Postplatz 2 / City, 6370 Stans.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.