Reports for Optik Knecht AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Optik Knecht AG
- Optik Knecht AG has its legal headquarters in Schaffhausen and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading with various goods».
- The company was founded on 24.12.1991 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 03.01.2012. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-105.894.877.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.12.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schaffhausen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.3.003.440-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.894.877
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Augenoptik-Fachgeschäfte zu führen, d.h. augenoptische Artikel zu bearbeiten und zu verkaufen, einschliesslich Handel mit verwandten Produkten sowie ophthalmologische Dienstleistungen anzubieten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Bollinger GmbH | Schaffhausen | <2004 | 16.06.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Optik Knecht AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6487038, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Optik Knecht AG, in Schaffhausen, CH-290.3.003.440-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 16.07.2009, S. 20, Publ. 5142900).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krönlein, Conrad, von Stein am Rhein, in Stein am Rhein, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5142900, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Optik Knecht AG, in Schaffhausen, CH-290.3.003.440-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 17.06.2009, S. 15, Publ. 5072600).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Metzger, Mario, von Eschenz, in Schaffhausen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Krönlein, Conrad, von Stein am Rhein, in Stein am Rhein, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5072600, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Optik Knecht AG, in Schaffhausen, CH-290.3.003.440-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 09.06.1997, S. 3928).
Statutenänderung:
14.05.2009.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Augenoptik-Fachgeschäfte zu führen, d.h. augenoptische Artikel zu bearbeiten und zu verkaufen, einschliesslich Handel mit verwandten Produkten sowie ophthalmologische Dienstleistungen anzubieten.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[gestrichen: Beabsichtigte Sachübernahme: Von Gerhard Knecht, Schaffhausen, die Augenoptik-Fachgeschäfte in Schaffhausen und in Diessenhofen zum Preis von höchstens CHF 600'000.--].Mitteilungen neu: Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Aktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Laut Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 14.05.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft nicht der ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhand Bollinger GmbH, in Schaffhausen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krönlein, Conrad, von Stein am Rhein, in Stein am Rhein, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident mit Einzelunterschrift];
Metzger, Mario, von Eschenz, in Schaffhausen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.