Reports for Omya Technology AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Omya Technology AG
- Omya Technology AG is currently active and the industry «Legal counsel». The legal headquarters are in Oftringen.
- There are 11 active persons registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 14.06.2013.
- The company Omya Technology AG is registered under the UID CHE-110.344.996.
- The address is identical with 12 other active companies. These include: Forsag AG, Mozaiq Switzerland AG, Omya (Schweiz) AG.
Management (11)
newest board members
Sven Wildner,
Dr. Thoralf Gliese,
Max André Schachenmann,
Eric Schachenmann
newest authorized signatories
Sven Wildner,
Dr. Thoralf Gliese,
Eva Maria Catillon-Eisterer,
Candide Villiger,
Dr. Bernhard Studer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oftringen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.024.947-9
UID/VAT
CHE-110.344.996
Sector
Legal counsel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten und Verwertung von immateriellen Werten, insbesondere von technischen Pateneten und Lizenzen. Zudem kann sie Forschungs- und Entwicklungsaufträge an andere Gesellschaften der Omya-Gruppe, insbesondere an die Omya Development AG, sowie an Dritte vergeben und daraus resultierende verwertbare immaterielle Werte in ihrem Namen registrieren; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 04.12.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Omya Technology SA
- Omya Technology Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Omya Technology AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 917375, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya Technology AG, in Oftringen, CHE-110.344.996, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 234 vom 30.11.2012, Publ. 6955012). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Omya Development AG, in Oftringen (CHE-110.344.950), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 6955012, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya Technology AG, in Oftringen, CHE-110.344.996, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 21.05.2012, Publ. 6685728).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Haag, Othmar Niklaus, von Warth-Weiningen, in Zollikerberg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Waibel, Dr. Roland, von Diepoldsau, in Therwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wildner, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Waltenschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6685728, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya Technology AG, in Oftringen, CH-400.3.024.947-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 04.06.2009, S. 2, Publ. 5049230).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wappler, Axel, von Hünenberg, in Buonas, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gliese, Dr. Thoralf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Sempach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Buchrain, ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.