Reports for Omya-Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Omya-Holding AG
- Omya-Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Oftringen and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 24.09.1996.
- On the 26.02.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Omya-Holding AG is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-103.519.977.
- The address is identical with 12 other active companies. These include: Forsag AG, Mozaiq Switzerland AG, Omya (Schweiz) AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Iwona Stasiewicz,
Markus Held,
Cédric Serge Suchet,
Jörg Matthias Keimer,
Sven Wildner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.09.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oftringen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.020.955-2
UID/VAT
CHE-103.519.977
CHE-116.326.548 VAT
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten und Verwaltung von finanziellen und industriellen Beteiligungen jeder Art; kann immaterielle Werte erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Tochtergesellschaften errichten sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 29.10.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Omya-Holding SA
- Omya-Holding Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Omya-Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005970669, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya-Holding AG, in Oftringen, CHE-103.519.977, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 21.07.2022, Publ. 1005526272).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer, Dr. Bernhard, von Sempach, in Olten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stasiewicz, Iwona, polnische Staatsangehörige, in Rothrist, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005526272, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya-Holding AG, in Oftringen, CHE-103.519.977, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 17.05.2022, Publ. 1005475655).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wildner, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Beinwil am See, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Waltenschwil].
Publication number: HR02-1005475655, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya-Holding AG, in Oftringen, CHE-103.519.977, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 18.03.2020, Publ. 1004855543).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studer, Dr. Bernhard, von Sempach, in Olten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Egerkingen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.