Reports for Omya Algol AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Omya Algol AG
- Omya Algol AG with its legal headquarters in Oftringen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Omya Algol AG is active.
- The management of the company Omya Algol AG, which was founded on the 14.07.2014, consists of 2 persons.
- On the 24.04.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Omya Algol AG is registered under the UID CHE-210.528.083.
- Forsag AG, Mozaiq Switzerland AG, Omya (Schweiz) AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.07.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oftringen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.038.533-8
UID/VAT
CHE-210.528.083
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten, Akquisition sowie Veräusserung von Beteiligungen in Unternehmungen aller Art, die im Bereich des Verkaufs und Vertriebs von gemahlenem Kalziumkarbonat sowie anderen chemischen Produkten im In- und Ausland tätig sind sowie Finanzierung von Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland (inklusive Kreditaufnahme zur Realisierung dieser Zwecke); kann Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen halten, Zweigniederlassungen errichten und Vermögenswerte akquirieren, halten und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Omya Algol Ltd
- Omya Algol SA
- Omal AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Omya Algol AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006016821, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya Algol AG, in Oftringen, CHE-210.528.083, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2022, Publ. 1005594983).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfaller, Harald, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Arlesheim, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Balzereit, Bernd, von Sempach, in Sempach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wildner, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Beinwil am See, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Held, Markus, von Churwalden, in Zuchwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005594983, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya Algol AG, in Oftringen, CHE-210.528.083, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 04.06.2021, Publ. 1005207286).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hansson, Fredrik, finnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Helsinki (FI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kettunen, Kalle Ilmari, finnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Espoo (FI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005207286, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Omya Algol AG, in Oftringen, CHE-210.528.083, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 13.03.2020, Publ. 1004852316).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Flinck, Karl Joakim Alexander, finnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Helsinki (FI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tynell, Peter, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Balzereit, Bernd, von Sempach, in Sempach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kettunen, Kalle Ilmari, finnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Espoo (FI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.