Reports for OLM distribution SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout OLM distribution SA
- OLM distribution SA has its legal headquarters in Genève, is active and operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company OLM distribution SA consists of 4 persons.
- On the 22.08.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register GE under the UID CHE-115.035.114.
- Companies with the same address as OLM distribution SA: ArchiDeco J.A Bouaniche, DECOBOX ARCHITECTURE Sàrl, DEVILLARD & SAPORITO SNC.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Abdurashid Muhmand,
Zahidullah Sajid,
Jamila Moussaoui Loukili,
Otmane Loukili
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.08.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.1.968.009-3
UID/VAT
CHE-115.035.114
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente, exploitation de tout commerce, notamment dans le domaine du tabac-alimentation, import-export
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: OLM distribution SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006112330, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
OLM distribution SA, à Genève, CHE-115.035.114 (FOSC du 30.01.2024, p. 0/1005948101). Le 01.05.2021, les actions au porteur ont été converties de par la loi en actions nominatives;
par décision de l'assemblée générale du 30.07.2024, les statuts de la société ont été adaptés à la conversion.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 50'000, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par courrier, courriel ou noification push. Statuts modifiés le 30.07.2024. La procuration de Safi Saeed Rahman est radiée. Procuration collective à deux, avec l'administratrice a été conférée à Muhmand Abdurashid, d'Afghanistan, à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005948101, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
OLM distribution SA, à Genève, CHE-115.035.114 (FOSC du 12.01.2023, p. 0/1005651218). Procuration collective à deux, avec l'administratrice a été conférée à Safi Saeed Rahman, d'Afghanistan, à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005651218, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
OLM distribution SA, à Genève, CHE-115.035.114 (FOSC du 22.07.2021, p. 0/1005255894). La procuration de Oruc Rifet est radiée. Procuration collective à deux, avec l'administratrice a été conférée à Sajid Zahidullah, d'Afghanistan, à Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.