Reports for Ökopower AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ökopower AG
- Ökopower AG has its legal headquarters in Ottenbach and is active. It operates in the sector «Extraction of and supply with natural gas».
- The management of the company Ökopower AG, which was founded on the 09.09.2004, consists of 4 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 19.06.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-111.997.698.
Management (4)
newest board members
Alexander Flacher,
Daniel Georg Gobbo,
Jeannine Baier,
Hans-Martin Meyer
newest authorized signatories
Alexander Flacher,
Daniel Georg Gobbo,
Jeannine Baier,
Hans-Martin Meyer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.09.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ottenbach
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.028.053-2
UID/VAT
CHE-111.997.698
Sector
Extraction of and supply with natural gas
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Verwertung von organischen Abfällen mit Energiegewinnung, insbesondere den Bau und den Betrieb von Vergär- und Kompostieranlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 02.08.2007 | 23.09.2019 | |
Hans J. Huber, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer | Birmensdorf (ZH) | 15.09.2004 | 01.08.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ökopower AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006060677, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ökopower AG, in Ottenbach, CHE-111.997.698, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2021, Publ. 1005363727).
Statutenänderung:
11.06.2024.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief oder auf elektronischem Weg an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Publication number: HR02-1005363727, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ökopower AG, in Ottenbach, CHE-111.997.698, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 24.09.2019, Publ. 1004722216).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schramm, Klaus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Windisch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Hans-Martin Meyer oder Jeannine Baier.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Hans-Martin, von Schleitheim und Schaffhausen, in Schlieren, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Daniel Gobbo oder Alexander Flacher [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Klaus Schramm oder Daniel Gobbo];
Baier, Jeannine, von Landquart, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Daniel Gobbo oder Alexander Flacher [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Klaus Schramm oder Daniel Gobbo];
Flacher, Alexander, von Humlikon, in Obersiggenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Jeannine Baier oder Hans-Martin Meyer.
Publication number: HR02-1004722216, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ökopower AG, in Ottenbach, CHE-111.997.698, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 08.06.2018, Publ. 4277685).
Statutenänderung:
16.09.2019. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Gemäss Erklärung vom 16.09.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KPMG AG (CHE-106.084.881), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.