Address
c/o Embassy Jewel AG
Grendelstrasse 2
6004 Luzern
Reports for Oath Holding GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Oath Holding GmbH
- Oath Holding GmbH is active in the industry «Operation of investment companies» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- Oath Holding GmbH has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 19.07.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-206.331.790.
- Next to the company Oath Holding GmbH there are 16 other active companies with an identical address. These include: AESKULAP International AG, borgas advisory GmbH, Carinus Domum AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.01.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.803.110-6
UID/VAT
CHE-206.331.790
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Erwerb und die Verwaltung von Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland, welche insbesondere im Bereich des Verkaufs von und Handel mit Luxusgütern, Schmuck, Uhren, Kunst und Accessoires tätig sind. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Sie kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann auch alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Konzerngesellschaften und Dritten, einschliesslich ihren (direkten und indirekten) Gesellschaftern sowie deren Konzerngesellschaften, Darlehen und andere direkte oder indirekte Finanzierungen gewähren, einschliesslich im Rahmen von Cash Pooling Vereinbarungen, und für deren Verbindlichkeiten Sicherheiten aller Art stellen, einschliesslich mittels Pfandrechten an oder fiduziarischen Übereignungen von Aktiven der Gesellschaft oder Garantien etwelcher Art, ob entgeltlich oder nicht.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 16.03.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Oath Holding Ltd Liab. Co.
- Oath Holding S.à r.l
- Oath Holding S.a g.l.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Oath Holding GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089029, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Oath Holding GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-206.331.790, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2024, Publ. 1005941232).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Züger, Sascha, von Wangen (SZ), in Pfäffikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Girardin, Marc, von Versoix, in Coppet, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steiner, Nicole, von Oberiberg, in Volketswil, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005941232, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Oath Holding GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-206.331.790, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2023, Publ. 1005901014).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Elzi, Martin, von Bosco/Gurin, in Obfelden, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gamper, Kurt, von Zürich, in Zürich, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005901014, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Oath Holding GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-206.331.790, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 23.03.2023, Publ. 1005707257).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Neuerburg, Barbara, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Richterswil, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.