Reports for Nyp SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nyp SA
- Nyp SA is active in the industry «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Sion.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 28.04.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Nyp SA is the following: CHE-107.366.112.
- Companies with the same address as Nyp SA: IGE promotion et développement SA, Le Claireau SA, Le petit bois, La Tzoumaz Sàrl.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
José Léandro Ferreira de Sousa,
Yves Pont,
Carmen Marie Jeanne Selis-Ribotel,
Samuel Pont
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.10.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.993.991-9
UID/VAT
CHE-107.366.112
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'acquisition, le commerce de tous produits manufacturés ou non, l'achat, la vente, la location et la gérance d'immeubles, l'exploitation de meublés et hôtels. La société exploite la résidence hôtelière "APPART'HÔTEL RESIDENCE DIZERENS" sise rue Dizerens 7b à Genève (cf. statuts pour but complet)
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SwissAudit (Mittelland) SA | Fribourg | 09.03.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire de Preux & Associés SA | Lancy | 24.02.2005 | 01.02.2023 | |
Gerofid, Société Fiduciaire SA | Genève | <2004 | 14.02.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Nyp SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005735027, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
NYP SA, à Sion, CHE-107.366.112, société anonyme (No. FOSC 48 du 09.03.2023, Publ. 1005697125).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Ferreira de Sousa, José Léandro, ressortissant portugais, à Genève, directeur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005697125, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
NYP SA, à Sion, CHE-107.366.112, société anonyme (No. FOSC 23 du 02.02.2023, Publ. 1005668677).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
SwissAudit (Mittelland) SA (CHE-106.531.070), à Fribourg, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005668677, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
NYP SA, à Sion, CHE-107.366.112, société anonyme (No. FOSC 202 du 18.10.2022, Publ. 1005585923).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Michel de Preux et Associés SA, Société Fiduciaire (CH-660.0.435.986-5), à Lancy, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.