Reports for Novosys AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Novosys AG
- Novosys AG with its legal headquarters in Unterägeri is active. Novosys AG operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management has one active person registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 29.12.2020.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZG is CHE-101.564.292.
- On the same address as Novosys AG there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Maria Lichtsteiner's Garten, we consult you GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.02.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Unterägeri
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.014.417-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.564.292
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen und Beratungen auf dem Gebiet der elektronischen Datenverarbeitung und von Gesamtsystemen im technischen Bereich; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NICON TREUHAND AG | Hünenberg | 16.01.2007 | 11.04.2011 | |
Abano Verwaltungen AG | Unterägeri | <2004 | 15.01.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Novosys Leasing und Systemtechnik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Novosys AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005061033, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Novosys Leasing und Systemtechnik AG, in Unterägeri, CHE-101.564.292, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 15.05.2015, S.0, Publ. 2153205).
Statutenänderung:
10.12.2020.
Firma neu:
Novosys AG.
Zweck neu:
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen und Beratungen auf dem Gebiet der elektronischen Datenverarbeitung und von Gesamtsystemen im technischen Bereich;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktien neu:
200 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 500.00 [bisher: 200 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 500.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ferigutti, Marco, von Wil (SG), in Wil (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Fischingen].
Publication number: 2153205, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Novosys Leasing und Systemtechnik AG, in Unterägeri, CHE-101.564.292, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 10.04.2015, Publ. 2090617).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grätzer, Ellen, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Unterägeri, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2090617, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Novosys Leasing und Systemtechnik AG, in Unterägeri, CHE-101.564.292, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 26.10.2012, Publ. 6905642).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fölmli, Rolf, von Luzern, in Küssnacht SZ, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ferigutti, Marco, von Wil SG, in Fischingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.