Reports for Nottaris Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nottaris Immobilien AG
- Nottaris Immobilien AG with its legal headquarters in Oberburg is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Nottaris Immobilien AG is active.
- The company was founded on 12.01.1973.
- On the 25.08.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Nottaris Immobilien AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.883.484.
- Nottaris AG, Nottaris Bauguss AG, Nottaris Holding AG have the same address as Nottaris Immobilien AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Nottaris,
François Nottaris,
Helga Nottaris-Meissner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.01.1973
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberburg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.005.390-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.883.484
CHE-230.956.944 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten, die Verwaltung und den Handel mit Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke und Immobilien erwerben oder veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidatio Treuhand AG | Steffisburg | 25.08.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
B&N Treuhand GmbH | Steffisburg | <2004 | 24.08.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Nottaris & Cie AG
- Nottaris AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Nottaris Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004964072, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Nottaris Immobilien AG, in Oberburg, CHE-101.883.484, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 28.06.2018, Publ. 4320983).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
B&N Treuhand AG (CHE-106.349.890), in Steffisburg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nottaris, Patrick, von Onsernone, in Châtillon FR, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Isorno];
Nottaris, Helga, von Onsernone, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Isorno];
Fidatio Treuhand AG (CHE-438.556.383), in Steffisburg, Revisionsstelle;
Nottaris, François, von Onsernone, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Isorno].
Publication number: 4320983, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Nottaris Immobilien AG, in Oberburg, CHE-101.883.484, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 47 vom 08.03.2016, Publ. 2709621).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Trasa GmbH, in Oberburg (CHE-115.563.732), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 20.06.2018 und Bilanz per 31.12.2017. Aktiven von CHF 25'147.66 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 260.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Stammanteile der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: 2709621, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Nottaris Immobilien AG, in Oberburg, CHE-101.883.484, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 201 vom 17.10.2014, Publ. 1774175).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nottaris, Patrick, von Isorno, in Châtillon FR, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nottaris, Helga, von Isorno, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Nottaris-Meissner, Helga, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nottaris, François, von Isorno, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.